JustMath.org

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 92

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 92

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 1, 2020.

Questions

1) 804 x 599=
2) 527 x 791=
3) 632 x 233=
4) 126 x 938=
5) 501 x 737=
6) 197 x 569=
7) 919 x 260=
8) 618 x 957=
9) 974 x 788=
10) 895 x 337=
11) 505 x 195=
12) 712 x 178=
13) 246 x 143=
14) 745 x 423=
15) 245 x 108=
16) 309 x 658=
17) 840 x 988=
18) 224 x 889=
19) 284 x 849=
20) 285 x 923=
21) 676 x 143=
22) 475 x 793=
23) 532 x 550=
24) 303 x 684=
25) 735 x 412=
26) 588 x 163=
27) 289 x 442=
28) 471 x 916=
29) 516 x 610=
30) 914 x 705=
31) 465 x 958=
32) 497 x 428=
33) 857 x 496=
34) 383 x 893=
35) 750 x 617=
36) 733 x 354=
37) 118 x 366=
38) 595 x 989=
39) 453 x 525=
40) 159 x 996=
41) 984 x 568=
42) 178 x 765=
43) 372 x 116=
44) 686 x 575=
45) 357 x 353=
46) 340 x 351=
47) 152 x 213=
48) 504 x 973=
49) 403 x 618=
50) 684 x 957=




Answers

1) 804 * 599 = 481596 2) 527 * 791 = 416857 3) 632 * 233 = 147256 4) 126 * 938 = 118188 5) 501 * 737 = 369237 6) 197 * 569 = 112093 7) 919 * 260 = 238940 8) 618 * 957 = 591426 9) 974 * 788 = 767512 10) 895 * 337 = 301615 11) 505 * 195 = 98475 12) 712 * 178 = 126736 13) 246 * 143 = 35178 14) 745 * 423 = 315135 15) 245 * 108 = 26460 16) 309 * 658 = 203322 17) 840 * 988 = 829920 18) 224 * 889 = 199136 19) 284 * 849 = 241116 20) 285 * 923 = 263055 21) 676 * 143 = 96668 22) 475 * 793 = 376675 23) 532 * 550 = 292600 24) 303 * 684 = 207252 25) 735 * 412 = 302820 26) 588 * 163 = 95844 27) 289 * 442 = 127738 28) 471 * 916 = 431436 29) 516 * 610 = 314760 30) 914 * 705 = 644370 31) 465 * 958 = 445470 32) 497 * 428 = 212716 33) 857 * 496 = 425072 34) 383 * 893 = 342019 35) 750 * 617 = 462750 36) 733 * 354 = 259482 37) 118 * 366 = 43188 38) 595 * 989 = 588455 39) 453 * 525 = 237825 40) 159 * 996 = 158364 41) 984 * 568 = 558912 42) 178 * 765 = 136170 43) 372 * 116 = 43152 44) 686 * 575 = 394450 45) 357 * 353 = 126021 46) 340 * 351 = 119340 47) 152 * 213 = 32376 48) 504 * 973 = 490392 49) 403 * 618 = 249054 50) 684 * 957 = 654588

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 92

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 92