JustMath.org

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 97

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 97

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 6, 2020.

Questions

1) 309 x 553=
2) 700 x 390=
3) 604 x 603=
4) 869 x 236=
5) 120 x 250=
6) 427 x 987=
7) 590 x 556=
8) 267 x 385=
9) 508 x 451=
10) 759 x 687=
11) 619 x 873=
12) 939 x 222=
13) 820 x 226=
14) 103 x 287=
15) 940 x 151=
16) 985 x 479=
17) 954 x 377=
18) 245 x 688=
19) 200 x 867=
20) 224 x 826=
21) 774 x 435=
22) 617 x 551=
23) 669 x 703=
24) 225 x 633=
25) 271 x 568=
26) 935 x 171=
27) 266 x 711=
28) 677 x 511=
29) 441 x 381=
30) 341 x 386=
31) 835 x 310=
32) 203 x 346=
33) 812 x 188=
34) 554 x 314=
35) 179 x 299=
36) 566 x 265=
37) 613 x 677=
38) 807 x 380=
39) 455 x 406=
40) 565 x 968=
41) 884 x 864=
42) 942 x 317=
43) 627 x 652=
44) 589 x 911=
45) 562 x 944=
46) 860 x 970=
47) 624 x 429=
48) 253 x 879=
49) 625 x 786=
50) 126 x 253=




Answers

1) 309 * 553 = 170877 2) 700 * 390 = 273000 3) 604 * 603 = 364212 4) 869 * 236 = 205084 5) 120 * 250 = 30000 6) 427 * 987 = 421449 7) 590 * 556 = 328040 8) 267 * 385 = 102795 9) 508 * 451 = 229108 10) 759 * 687 = 521433 11) 619 * 873 = 540387 12) 939 * 222 = 208458 13) 820 * 226 = 185320 14) 103 * 287 = 29561 15) 940 * 151 = 141940 16) 985 * 479 = 471815 17) 954 * 377 = 359658 18) 245 * 688 = 168560 19) 200 * 867 = 173400 20) 224 * 826 = 185024 21) 774 * 435 = 336690 22) 617 * 551 = 339967 23) 669 * 703 = 470307 24) 225 * 633 = 142425 25) 271 * 568 = 153928 26) 935 * 171 = 159885 27) 266 * 711 = 189126 28) 677 * 511 = 345947 29) 441 * 381 = 168021 30) 341 * 386 = 131626 31) 835 * 310 = 258850 32) 203 * 346 = 70238 33) 812 * 188 = 152656 34) 554 * 314 = 173956 35) 179 * 299 = 53521 36) 566 * 265 = 149990 37) 613 * 677 = 415001 38) 807 * 380 = 306660 39) 455 * 406 = 184730 40) 565 * 968 = 546920 41) 884 * 864 = 763776 42) 942 * 317 = 298614 43) 627 * 652 = 408804 44) 589 * 911 = 536579 45) 562 * 944 = 530528 46) 860 * 970 = 834200 47) 624 * 429 = 267696 48) 253 * 879 = 222387 49) 625 * 786 = 491250 50) 126 * 253 = 31878

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 97

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 97