JustMath.org

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 98

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 98

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 7, 2020.

Questions

1) 931 x 403=
2) 561 x 451=
3) 353 x 936=
4) 120 x 350=
5) 739 x 914=
6) 385 x 825=
7) 567 x 133=
8) 235 x 789=
9) 156 x 809=
10) 932 x 228=
11) 860 x 404=
12) 642 x 363=
13) 376 x 288=
14) 684 x 173=
15) 487 x 834=
16) 298 x 815=
17) 212 x 213=
18) 459 x 967=
19) 123 x 433=
20) 758 x 420=
21) 533 x 871=
22) 952 x 456=
23) 906 x 729=
24) 903 x 284=
25) 105 x 214=
26) 579 x 631=
27) 526 x 380=
28) 304 x 698=
29) 574 x 975=
30) 866 x 943=
31) 266 x 437=
32) 314 x 510=
33) 805 x 421=
34) 727 x 309=
35) 983 x 840=
36) 838 x 402=
37) 167 x 265=
38) 990 x 572=
39) 687 x 916=
40) 214 x 649=
41) 218 x 338=
42) 316 x 922=
43) 955 x 345=
44) 789 x 492=
45) 702 x 571=
46) 258 x 412=
47) 608 x 682=
48) 161 x 265=
49) 800 x 708=
50) 270 x 979=




Answers

1) 931 * 403 = 375193 2) 561 * 451 = 253011 3) 353 * 936 = 330408 4) 120 * 350 = 42000 5) 739 * 914 = 675446 6) 385 * 825 = 317625 7) 567 * 133 = 75411 8) 235 * 789 = 185415 9) 156 * 809 = 126204 10) 932 * 228 = 212496 11) 860 * 404 = 347440 12) 642 * 363 = 233046 13) 376 * 288 = 108288 14) 684 * 173 = 118332 15) 487 * 834 = 406158 16) 298 * 815 = 242870 17) 212 * 213 = 45156 18) 459 * 967 = 443853 19) 123 * 433 = 53259 20) 758 * 420 = 318360 21) 533 * 871 = 464243 22) 952 * 456 = 434112 23) 906 * 729 = 660474 24) 903 * 284 = 256452 25) 105 * 214 = 22470 26) 579 * 631 = 365349 27) 526 * 380 = 199880 28) 304 * 698 = 212192 29) 574 * 975 = 559650 30) 866 * 943 = 816638 31) 266 * 437 = 116242 32) 314 * 510 = 160140 33) 805 * 421 = 338905 34) 727 * 309 = 224643 35) 983 * 840 = 825720 36) 838 * 402 = 336876 37) 167 * 265 = 44255 38) 990 * 572 = 566280 39) 687 * 916 = 629292 40) 214 * 649 = 138886 41) 218 * 338 = 73684 42) 316 * 922 = 291352 43) 955 * 345 = 329475 44) 789 * 492 = 388188 45) 702 * 571 = 400842 46) 258 * 412 = 106296 47) 608 * 682 = 414656 48) 161 * 265 = 42665 49) 800 * 708 = 566400 50) 270 * 979 = 264330

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 98

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 98