JustMath.org

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 99

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 99

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 8, 2020.

Questions

1) 462 x 282=
2) 671 x 438=
3) 694 x 930=
4) 946 x 355=
5) 663 x 789=
6) 334 x 265=
7) 434 x 160=
8) 254 x 855=
9) 381 x 167=
10) 649 x 265=
11) 937 x 344=
12) 143 x 275=
13) 215 x 720=
14) 163 x 246=
15) 519 x 410=
16) 544 x 921=
17) 693 x 151=
18) 402 x 719=
19) 310 x 667=
20) 408 x 428=
21) 717 x 141=
22) 819 x 779=
23) 834 x 695=
24) 768 x 592=
25) 976 x 549=
26) 960 x 251=
27) 313 x 494=
28) 604 x 332=
29) 896 x 519=
30) 322 x 973=
31) 929 x 408=
32) 135 x 598=
33) 124 x 127=
34) 846 x 303=
35) 880 x 459=
36) 846 x 569=
37) 330 x 743=
38) 962 x 206=
39) 312 x 367=
40) 937 x 912=
41) 459 x 204=
42) 120 x 152=
43) 431 x 972=
44) 631 x 304=
45) 743 x 962=
46) 266 x 437=
47) 702 x 603=
48) 792 x 231=
49) 888 x 539=
50) 529 x 977=




Answers

1) 462 * 282 = 130284 2) 671 * 438 = 293898 3) 694 * 930 = 645420 4) 946 * 355 = 335830 5) 663 * 789 = 523107 6) 334 * 265 = 88510 7) 434 * 160 = 69440 8) 254 * 855 = 217170 9) 381 * 167 = 63627 10) 649 * 265 = 171985 11) 937 * 344 = 322328 12) 143 * 275 = 39325 13) 215 * 720 = 154800 14) 163 * 246 = 40098 15) 519 * 410 = 212790 16) 544 * 921 = 501024 17) 693 * 151 = 104643 18) 402 * 719 = 289038 19) 310 * 667 = 206770 20) 408 * 428 = 174624 21) 717 * 141 = 101097 22) 819 * 779 = 638001 23) 834 * 695 = 579630 24) 768 * 592 = 454656 25) 976 * 549 = 535824 26) 960 * 251 = 240960 27) 313 * 494 = 154622 28) 604 * 332 = 200528 29) 896 * 519 = 465024 30) 322 * 973 = 313306 31) 929 * 408 = 379032 32) 135 * 598 = 80730 33) 124 * 127 = 15748 34) 846 * 303 = 256338 35) 880 * 459 = 403920 36) 846 * 569 = 481374 37) 330 * 743 = 245190 38) 962 * 206 = 198172 39) 312 * 367 = 114504 40) 937 * 912 = 854544 41) 459 * 204 = 93636 42) 120 * 152 = 18240 43) 431 * 972 = 418932 44) 631 * 304 = 191824 45) 743 * 962 = 714766 46) 266 * 437 = 116242 47) 702 * 603 = 423306 48) 792 * 231 = 182952 49) 888 * 539 = 478632 50) 529 * 977 = 516833

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 99

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 99