JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 111

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 111

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 20, 2020.

Questions

1) 1476 x 37=
2) 9717 x 27=
3) 4509 x 65=
4) 5691 x 78=
5) 8606 x 40=
6) 3377 x 82=
7) 5776 x 54=
8) 6023 x 80=
9) 7566 x 85=
10) 5361 x 86=
11) 9559 x 67=
12) 2832 x 70=
13) 9051 x 44=
14) 2304 x 34=
15) 6336 x 31=
16) 5371 x 36=
17) 1677 x 84=
18) 5260 x 58=
19) 8848 x 91=
20) 2862 x 37=
21) 3553 x 92=
22) 3559 x 81=
23) 8570 x 69=
24) 8905 x 37=
25) 8834 x 74=
26) 8736 x 69=
27) 8545 x 74=
28) 2243 x 35=
29) 6655 x 83=
30) 6988 x 60=
31) 3805 x 67=
32) 1259 x 13=
33) 4008 x 48=
34) 8924 x 43=
35) 9021 x 63=
36) 5133 x 54=
37) 9115 x 92=
38) 7375 x 85=
39) 9680 x 12=
40) 2586 x 22=
41) 5332 x 46=
42) 2698 x 29=
43) 2130 x 77=
44) 6496 x 61=
45) 1453 x 88=
46) 6785 x 35=
47) 6002 x 28=
48) 7092 x 72=
49) 1091 x 66=
50) 2185 x 64=




Answers

1) 1476 * 37 = 54612 2) 9717 * 27 = 262359 3) 4509 * 65 = 293085 4) 5691 * 78 = 443898 5) 8606 * 40 = 344240 6) 3377 * 82 = 276914 7) 5776 * 54 = 311904 8) 6023 * 80 = 481840 9) 7566 * 85 = 643110 10) 5361 * 86 = 461046 11) 9559 * 67 = 640453 12) 2832 * 70 = 198240 13) 9051 * 44 = 398244 14) 2304 * 34 = 78336 15) 6336 * 31 = 196416 16) 5371 * 36 = 193356 17) 1677 * 84 = 140868 18) 5260 * 58 = 305080 19) 8848 * 91 = 805168 20) 2862 * 37 = 105894 21) 3553 * 92 = 326876 22) 3559 * 81 = 288279 23) 8570 * 69 = 591330 24) 8905 * 37 = 329485 25) 8834 * 74 = 653716 26) 8736 * 69 = 602784 27) 8545 * 74 = 632330 28) 2243 * 35 = 78505 29) 6655 * 83 = 552365 30) 6988 * 60 = 419280 31) 3805 * 67 = 254935 32) 1259 * 13 = 16367 33) 4008 * 48 = 192384 34) 8924 * 43 = 383732 35) 9021 * 63 = 568323 36) 5133 * 54 = 277182 37) 9115 * 92 = 838580 38) 7375 * 85 = 626875 39) 9680 * 12 = 116160 40) 2586 * 22 = 56892 41) 5332 * 46 = 245272 42) 2698 * 29 = 78242 43) 2130 * 77 = 164010 44) 6496 * 61 = 396256 45) 1453 * 88 = 127864 46) 6785 * 35 = 237475 47) 6002 * 28 = 168056 48) 7092 * 72 = 510624 49) 1091 * 66 = 72006 50) 2185 * 64 = 139840

Next

Percent worksheets 111

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 111

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets