1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 29

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 29

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on September 29, 2020.

Questions

1) 8742 x 94=
2) 3784 x 81=
3) 9874 x 15=
4) 6379 x 94=
5) 5274 x 94=
6) 7627 x 41=
7) 3360 x 32=
8) 8099 x 47=
9) 3317 x 52=
10) 3940 x 28=
11) 4572 x 53=
12) 2194 x 69=
13) 9983 x 50=
14) 9679 x 57=
15) 4952 x 26=
16) 8234 x 19=
17) 8138 x 17=
18) 2135 x 18=
19) 8136 x 85=
20) 3573 x 79=
21) 2915 x 56=
22) 7916 x 52=
23) 3664 x 90=
24) 3143 x 28=
25) 2081 x 92=
26) 1454 x 53=
27) 6371 x 55=
28) 9283 x 71=
29) 7531 x 36=
30) 5251 x 14=
31) 1261 x 63=
32) 5209 x 70=
33) 4472 x 60=
34) 6111 x 25=
35) 9828 x 27=
36) 2298 x 68=
37) 1344 x 33=
38) 8609 x 70=
39) 5153 x 70=
40) 8044 x 39=
41) 2546 x 49=
42) 5970 x 26=
43) 9544 x 25=
44) 2443 x 11=
45) 9437 x 10=
46) 5926 x 35=
47) 1572 x 22=
48) 5884 x 30=
49) 5328 x 88=
50) 1218 x 96=




Answers

1) 8742 * 94 = 821748 2) 3784 * 81 = 306504 3) 9874 * 15 = 148110 4) 6379 * 94 = 599626 5) 5274 * 94 = 495756 6) 7627 * 41 = 312707 7) 3360 * 32 = 107520 8) 8099 * 47 = 380653 9) 3317 * 52 = 172484 10) 3940 * 28 = 110320 11) 4572 * 53 = 242316 12) 2194 * 69 = 151386 13) 9983 * 50 = 499150 14) 9679 * 57 = 551703 15) 4952 * 26 = 128752 16) 8234 * 19 = 156446 17) 8138 * 17 = 138346 18) 2135 * 18 = 38430 19) 8136 * 85 = 691560 20) 3573 * 79 = 282267 21) 2915 * 56 = 163240 22) 7916 * 52 = 411632 23) 3664 * 90 = 329760 24) 3143 * 28 = 88004 25) 2081 * 92 = 191452 26) 1454 * 53 = 77062 27) 6371 * 55 = 350405 28) 9283 * 71 = 659093 29) 7531 * 36 = 271116 30) 5251 * 14 = 73514 31) 1261 * 63 = 79443 32) 5209 * 70 = 364630 33) 4472 * 60 = 268320 34) 6111 * 25 = 152775 35) 9828 * 27 = 265356 36) 2298 * 68 = 156264 37) 1344 * 33 = 44352 38) 8609 * 70 = 602630 39) 5153 * 70 = 360710 40) 8044 * 39 = 313716 41) 2546 * 49 = 124754 42) 5970 * 26 = 155220 43) 9544 * 25 = 238600 44) 2443 * 11 = 26873 45) 9437 * 10 = 94370 46) 5926 * 35 = 207410 47) 1572 * 22 = 34584 48) 5884 * 30 = 176520 49) 5328 * 88 = 468864 50) 1218 * 96 = 116928

Next

Percent worksheets 29

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 29

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 89

Prime numbers Worksheet 89

Percent worksheets 89

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 89

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 89

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 89

Factors worksheet89

Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Ratios worksheets 88

Prime numbers Worksheet 88

Percent worksheets 88

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets