1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 30

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 30

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on September 30, 2020.

Questions

1) 3883 x 37=
2) 6494 x 90=
3) 9206 x 93=
4) 3652 x 18=
5) 1248 x 18=
6) 3377 x 76=
7) 3716 x 96=
8) 1896 x 27=
9) 2919 x 43=
10) 2952 x 92=
11) 2769 x 49=
12) 4521 x 85=
13) 2626 x 69=
14) 2700 x 23=
15) 4046 x 89=
16) 3945 x 72=
17) 6170 x 90=
18) 2670 x 85=
19) 4545 x 53=
20) 1099 x 90=
21) 5545 x 91=
22) 3435 x 31=
23) 2758 x 21=
24) 8790 x 59=
25) 1881 x 85=
26) 9148 x 72=
27) 6201 x 21=
28) 2867 x 59=
29) 3002 x 34=
30) 2441 x 71=
31) 2869 x 23=
32) 9947 x 14=
33) 5388 x 39=
34) 3263 x 29=
35) 7712 x 74=
36) 6048 x 59=
37) 8804 x 73=
38) 2039 x 18=
39) 4856 x 23=
40) 5937 x 84=
41) 1967 x 67=
42) 2369 x 53=
43) 4571 x 80=
44) 6130 x 98=
45) 9716 x 53=
46) 4978 x 26=
47) 3184 x 12=
48) 3945 x 28=
49) 9741 x 90=
50) 8697 x 12=




Answers

1) 3883 * 37 = 143671 2) 6494 * 90 = 584460 3) 9206 * 93 = 856158 4) 3652 * 18 = 65736 5) 1248 * 18 = 22464 6) 3377 * 76 = 256652 7) 3716 * 96 = 356736 8) 1896 * 27 = 51192 9) 2919 * 43 = 125517 10) 2952 * 92 = 271584 11) 2769 * 49 = 135681 12) 4521 * 85 = 384285 13) 2626 * 69 = 181194 14) 2700 * 23 = 62100 15) 4046 * 89 = 360094 16) 3945 * 72 = 284040 17) 6170 * 90 = 555300 18) 2670 * 85 = 226950 19) 4545 * 53 = 240885 20) 1099 * 90 = 98910 21) 5545 * 91 = 504595 22) 3435 * 31 = 106485 23) 2758 * 21 = 57918 24) 8790 * 59 = 518610 25) 1881 * 85 = 159885 26) 9148 * 72 = 658656 27) 6201 * 21 = 130221 28) 2867 * 59 = 169153 29) 3002 * 34 = 102068 30) 2441 * 71 = 173311 31) 2869 * 23 = 65987 32) 9947 * 14 = 139258 33) 5388 * 39 = 210132 34) 3263 * 29 = 94627 35) 7712 * 74 = 570688 36) 6048 * 59 = 356832 37) 8804 * 73 = 642692 38) 2039 * 18 = 36702 39) 4856 * 23 = 111688 40) 5937 * 84 = 498708 41) 1967 * 67 = 131789 42) 2369 * 53 = 125557 43) 4571 * 80 = 365680 44) 6130 * 98 = 600740 45) 9716 * 53 = 514948 46) 4978 * 26 = 129428 47) 3184 * 12 = 38208 48) 3945 * 28 = 110460 49) 9741 * 90 = 876690 50) 8697 * 12 = 104364

Next

Percent worksheets 30

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 30

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 89

Prime numbers Worksheet 89

Percent worksheets 89

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 89

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 89

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 89

Factors worksheet89

Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Ratios worksheets 88

Prime numbers Worksheet 88

Percent worksheets 88

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets