1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 33

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 33

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on October 3, 2020.

Questions

1) 9778 x 86=
2) 7716 x 57=
3) 3310 x 87=
4) 4720 x 93=
5) 3010 x 15=
6) 1293 x 66=
7) 1539 x 33=
8) 2737 x 82=
9) 7111 x 10=
10) 7319 x 65=
11) 1366 x 97=
12) 2152 x 29=
13) 3823 x 83=
14) 2365 x 58=
15) 4157 x 40=
16) 7592 x 32=
17) 5626 x 30=
18) 6232 x 80=
19) 3792 x 94=
20) 2778 x 30=
21) 5215 x 36=
22) 3497 x 83=
23) 8571 x 96=
24) 1127 x 67=
25) 7641 x 64=
26) 8722 x 28=
27) 8932 x 42=
28) 5723 x 64=
29) 6708 x 79=
30) 6598 x 30=
31) 3644 x 54=
32) 7111 x 13=
33) 9022 x 75=
34) 7926 x 66=
35) 2928 x 91=
36) 5220 x 63=
37) 4728 x 42=
38) 7240 x 50=
39) 4743 x 42=
40) 4221 x 9=
41) 9343 x 31=
42) 6751 x 38=
43) 1834 x 9=
44) 1969 x 32=
45) 2532 x 87=
46) 7319 x 61=
47) 4704 x 99=
48) 1612 x 34=
49) 8693 x 32=
50) 7751 x 45=




Answers

1) 9778 * 86 = 840908 2) 7716 * 57 = 439812 3) 3310 * 87 = 287970 4) 4720 * 93 = 438960 5) 3010 * 15 = 45150 6) 1293 * 66 = 85338 7) 1539 * 33 = 50787 8) 2737 * 82 = 224434 9) 7111 * 10 = 71110 10) 7319 * 65 = 475735 11) 1366 * 97 = 132502 12) 2152 * 29 = 62408 13) 3823 * 83 = 317309 14) 2365 * 58 = 137170 15) 4157 * 40 = 166280 16) 7592 * 32 = 242944 17) 5626 * 30 = 168780 18) 6232 * 80 = 498560 19) 3792 * 94 = 356448 20) 2778 * 30 = 83340 21) 5215 * 36 = 187740 22) 3497 * 83 = 290251 23) 8571 * 96 = 822816 24) 1127 * 67 = 75509 25) 7641 * 64 = 489024 26) 8722 * 28 = 244216 27) 8932 * 42 = 375144 28) 5723 * 64 = 366272 29) 6708 * 79 = 529932 30) 6598 * 30 = 197940 31) 3644 * 54 = 196776 32) 7111 * 13 = 92443 33) 9022 * 75 = 676650 34) 7926 * 66 = 523116 35) 2928 * 91 = 266448 36) 5220 * 63 = 328860 37) 4728 * 42 = 198576 38) 7240 * 50 = 362000 39) 4743 * 42 = 199206 40) 4221 * 9 = 37989 41) 9343 * 31 = 289633 42) 6751 * 38 = 256538 43) 1834 * 9 = 16506 44) 1969 * 32 = 63008 45) 2532 * 87 = 220284 46) 7319 * 61 = 446459 47) 4704 * 99 = 465696 48) 1612 * 34 = 54808 49) 8693 * 32 = 278176 50) 7751 * 45 = 348795

Next

Percent worksheets 33

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 33

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 91

Prime numbers Worksheet 91

Percent worksheets 91

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 91

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 91

Factors worksheet91

Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Ratios worksheets 90

Prime numbers Worksheet 90

Percent worksheets 90

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets