1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 34

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 34

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on October 4, 2020.

Questions

1) 8625 x 28=
2) 8192 x 23=
3) 4595 x 90=
4) 2895 x 35=
5) 2476 x 81=
6) 7647 x 97=
7) 8997 x 9=
8) 6010 x 33=
9) 9442 x 24=
10) 7083 x 89=
11) 1078 x 62=
12) 5394 x 98=
13) 8370 x 47=
14) 5004 x 62=
15) 5443 x 88=
16) 1411 x 41=
17) 7120 x 95=
18) 7478 x 80=
19) 8743 x 58=
20) 8869 x 25=
21) 8189 x 54=
22) 4963 x 80=
23) 8547 x 29=
24) 1515 x 88=
25) 9665 x 45=
26) 7345 x 73=
27) 5327 x 75=
28) 7800 x 57=
29) 7862 x 65=
30) 6778 x 68=
31) 2375 x 55=
32) 1027 x 58=
33) 5594 x 28=
34) 5957 x 44=
35) 2370 x 95=
36) 1814 x 99=
37) 5287 x 16=
38) 1929 x 66=
39) 1803 x 73=
40) 5298 x 95=
41) 7751 x 72=
42) 6655 x 44=
43) 3811 x 76=
44) 3941 x 86=
45) 9849 x 15=
46) 6530 x 99=
47) 6984 x 99=
48) 5196 x 29=
49) 8864 x 66=
50) 6137 x 51=




Answers

1) 8625 * 28 = 241500 2) 8192 * 23 = 188416 3) 4595 * 90 = 413550 4) 2895 * 35 = 101325 5) 2476 * 81 = 200556 6) 7647 * 97 = 741759 7) 8997 * 9 = 80973 8) 6010 * 33 = 198330 9) 9442 * 24 = 226608 10) 7083 * 89 = 630387 11) 1078 * 62 = 66836 12) 5394 * 98 = 528612 13) 8370 * 47 = 393390 14) 5004 * 62 = 310248 15) 5443 * 88 = 478984 16) 1411 * 41 = 57851 17) 7120 * 95 = 676400 18) 7478 * 80 = 598240 19) 8743 * 58 = 507094 20) 8869 * 25 = 221725 21) 8189 * 54 = 442206 22) 4963 * 80 = 397040 23) 8547 * 29 = 247863 24) 1515 * 88 = 133320 25) 9665 * 45 = 434925 26) 7345 * 73 = 536185 27) 5327 * 75 = 399525 28) 7800 * 57 = 444600 29) 7862 * 65 = 511030 30) 6778 * 68 = 460904 31) 2375 * 55 = 130625 32) 1027 * 58 = 59566 33) 5594 * 28 = 156632 34) 5957 * 44 = 262108 35) 2370 * 95 = 225150 36) 1814 * 99 = 179586 37) 5287 * 16 = 84592 38) 1929 * 66 = 127314 39) 1803 * 73 = 131619 40) 5298 * 95 = 503310 41) 7751 * 72 = 558072 42) 6655 * 44 = 292820 43) 3811 * 76 = 289636 44) 3941 * 86 = 338926 45) 9849 * 15 = 147735 46) 6530 * 99 = 646470 47) 6984 * 99 = 691416 48) 5196 * 29 = 150684 49) 8864 * 66 = 585024 50) 6137 * 51 = 312987

Next

Percent worksheets 34

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 34

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 89

Prime numbers Worksheet 89

Percent worksheets 89

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 89

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 89

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 89

Factors worksheet89

Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Ratios worksheets 88

Prime numbers Worksheet 88

Percent worksheets 88

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets