1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 38

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 38

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on October 8, 2020.

Questions

1) 2401 x 89=
2) 4511 x 18=
3) 1659 x 43=
4) 2017 x 13=
5) 4098 x 35=
6) 9224 x 94=
7) 5673 x 25=
8) 3093 x 70=
9) 1900 x 45=
10) 9458 x 57=
11) 3124 x 82=
12) 3941 x 78=
13) 5235 x 39=
14) 6301 x 60=
15) 5956 x 88=
16) 4866 x 33=
17) 5364 x 38=
18) 5865 x 31=
19) 3106 x 43=
20) 6085 x 19=
21) 1498 x 43=
22) 8269 x 60=
23) 3318 x 93=
24) 5382 x 75=
25) 5410 x 12=
26) 6853 x 35=
27) 3406 x 64=
28) 5654 x 42=
29) 2562 x 75=
30) 4090 x 61=
31) 2057 x 15=
32) 1816 x 25=
33) 9457 x 59=
34) 8593 x 85=
35) 8549 x 23=
36) 7585 x 78=
37) 2220 x 51=
38) 3387 x 62=
39) 2642 x 54=
40) 6170 x 11=
41) 6367 x 12=
42) 2455 x 56=
43) 8184 x 48=
44) 2481 x 75=
45) 1596 x 89=
46) 9238 x 55=
47) 6539 x 90=
48) 9818 x 46=
49) 7969 x 25=
50) 4844 x 56=




Answers

1) 2401 * 89 = 213689 2) 4511 * 18 = 81198 3) 1659 * 43 = 71337 4) 2017 * 13 = 26221 5) 4098 * 35 = 143430 6) 9224 * 94 = 867056 7) 5673 * 25 = 141825 8) 3093 * 70 = 216510 9) 1900 * 45 = 85500 10) 9458 * 57 = 539106 11) 3124 * 82 = 256168 12) 3941 * 78 = 307398 13) 5235 * 39 = 204165 14) 6301 * 60 = 378060 15) 5956 * 88 = 524128 16) 4866 * 33 = 160578 17) 5364 * 38 = 203832 18) 5865 * 31 = 181815 19) 3106 * 43 = 133558 20) 6085 * 19 = 115615 21) 1498 * 43 = 64414 22) 8269 * 60 = 496140 23) 3318 * 93 = 308574 24) 5382 * 75 = 403650 25) 5410 * 12 = 64920 26) 6853 * 35 = 239855 27) 3406 * 64 = 217984 28) 5654 * 42 = 237468 29) 2562 * 75 = 192150 30) 4090 * 61 = 249490 31) 2057 * 15 = 30855 32) 1816 * 25 = 45400 33) 9457 * 59 = 557963 34) 8593 * 85 = 730405 35) 8549 * 23 = 196627 36) 7585 * 78 = 591630 37) 2220 * 51 = 113220 38) 3387 * 62 = 209994 39) 2642 * 54 = 142668 40) 6170 * 11 = 67870 41) 6367 * 12 = 76404 42) 2455 * 56 = 137480 43) 8184 * 48 = 392832 44) 2481 * 75 = 186075 45) 1596 * 89 = 142044 46) 9238 * 55 = 508090 47) 6539 * 90 = 588510 48) 9818 * 46 = 451628 49) 7969 * 25 = 199225 50) 4844 * 56 = 271264

Next

Percent worksheets 38

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 38

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 91

Prime numbers Worksheet 91

Percent worksheets 91

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 91

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 91

Factors worksheet91

Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Ratios worksheets 90

Prime numbers Worksheet 90

Percent worksheets 90

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets