1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 39

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 39

Last updated on December 3, 2020. Created on October 9, 2020.

Questions

1) 5611 x 17=
2) 8600 x 27=
3) 7188 x 44=
4) 7409 x 47=
5) 3602 x 72=
6) 2169 x 27=
7) 5340 x 36=
8) 5847 x 70=
9) 2794 x 75=
10) 4930 x 18=
11) 1248 x 65=
12) 1606 x 25=
13) 6007 x 45=
14) 9934 x 34=
15) 3027 x 71=
16) 5748 x 67=
17) 3345 x 75=
18) 2672 x 91=
19) 2122 x 96=
20) 9510 x 60=
21) 1596 x 48=
22) 4034 x 31=
23) 4058 x 41=
24) 4016 x 59=
25) 4329 x 30=
26) 6360 x 19=
27) 5753 x 93=
28) 4211 x 11=
29) 6609 x 76=
30) 2860 x 66=
31) 9704 x 42=
32) 3763 x 56=
33) 1456 x 61=
34) 3646 x 79=
35) 4652 x 65=
36) 2316 x 68=
37) 3675 x 14=
38) 3778 x 29=
39) 4270 x 57=
40) 1486 x 38=
41) 9909 x 78=
42) 4228 x 42=
43) 9584 x 97=
44) 8711 x 67=
45) 1034 x 40=
46) 4900 x 45=
47) 5745 x 75=
48) 9363 x 78=
49) 7366 x 26=
50) 3089 x 10=




Answers

1) 5611 * 17 = 95387 2) 8600 * 27 = 232200 3) 7188 * 44 = 316272 4) 7409 * 47 = 348223 5) 3602 * 72 = 259344 6) 2169 * 27 = 58563 7) 5340 * 36 = 192240 8) 5847 * 70 = 409290 9) 2794 * 75 = 209550 10) 4930 * 18 = 88740 11) 1248 * 65 = 81120 12) 1606 * 25 = 40150 13) 6007 * 45 = 270315 14) 9934 * 34 = 337756 15) 3027 * 71 = 214917 16) 5748 * 67 = 385116 17) 3345 * 75 = 250875 18) 2672 * 91 = 243152 19) 2122 * 96 = 203712 20) 9510 * 60 = 570600 21) 1596 * 48 = 76608 22) 4034 * 31 = 125054 23) 4058 * 41 = 166378 24) 4016 * 59 = 236944 25) 4329 * 30 = 129870 26) 6360 * 19 = 120840 27) 5753 * 93 = 535029 28) 4211 * 11 = 46321 29) 6609 * 76 = 502284 30) 2860 * 66 = 188760 31) 9704 * 42 = 407568 32) 3763 * 56 = 210728 33) 1456 * 61 = 88816 34) 3646 * 79 = 288034 35) 4652 * 65 = 302380 36) 2316 * 68 = 157488 37) 3675 * 14 = 51450 38) 3778 * 29 = 109562 39) 4270 * 57 = 243390 40) 1486 * 38 = 56468 41) 9909 * 78 = 772902 42) 4228 * 42 = 177576 43) 9584 * 97 = 929648 44) 8711 * 67 = 583637 45) 1034 * 40 = 41360 46) 4900 * 45 = 220500 47) 5745 * 75 = 430875 48) 9363 * 78 = 730314 49) 7366 * 26 = 191516 50) 3089 * 10 = 30890

Next

Percent worksheets 39

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 39

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 94

Prime numbers Worksheet 94

Percent worksheets 94

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 94

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 94

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 94

Factors worksheet94

Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Ratios worksheets 93

Prime numbers Worksheet 93

Percent worksheets 93

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets