1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 41

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 41

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on October 11, 2020.

Questions

1) 8680 x 46=
2) 4970 x 50=
3) 2081 x 32=
4) 8144 x 29=
5) 5146 x 81=
6) 3196 x 17=
7) 8736 x 25=
8) 3831 x 59=
9) 8961 x 59=
10) 8383 x 54=
11) 9604 x 23=
12) 6360 x 21=
13) 2990 x 56=
14) 7866 x 80=
15) 4651 x 55=
16) 8776 x 17=
17) 3705 x 82=
18) 2725 x 48=
19) 2551 x 86=
20) 2641 x 23=
21) 6150 x 91=
22) 5016 x 56=
23) 2616 x 28=
24) 9780 x 63=
25) 3517 x 75=
26) 9044 x 36=
27) 2448 x 96=
28) 7945 x 32=
29) 2383 x 36=
30) 5233 x 56=
31) 2249 x 62=
32) 5095 x 37=
33) 1642 x 30=
34) 5316 x 27=
35) 8511 x 92=
36) 5687 x 68=
37) 7928 x 23=
38) 2518 x 45=
39) 8998 x 58=
40) 8509 x 22=
41) 3849 x 41=
42) 7861 x 26=
43) 5204 x 32=
44) 6693 x 83=
45) 8369 x 88=
46) 7374 x 13=
47) 2925 x 97=
48) 4383 x 96=
49) 4241 x 47=
50) 8659 x 98=




Answers

1) 8680 * 46 = 399280 2) 4970 * 50 = 248500 3) 2081 * 32 = 66592 4) 8144 * 29 = 236176 5) 5146 * 81 = 416826 6) 3196 * 17 = 54332 7) 8736 * 25 = 218400 8) 3831 * 59 = 226029 9) 8961 * 59 = 528699 10) 8383 * 54 = 452682 11) 9604 * 23 = 220892 12) 6360 * 21 = 133560 13) 2990 * 56 = 167440 14) 7866 * 80 = 629280 15) 4651 * 55 = 255805 16) 8776 * 17 = 149192 17) 3705 * 82 = 303810 18) 2725 * 48 = 130800 19) 2551 * 86 = 219386 20) 2641 * 23 = 60743 21) 6150 * 91 = 559650 22) 5016 * 56 = 280896 23) 2616 * 28 = 73248 24) 9780 * 63 = 616140 25) 3517 * 75 = 263775 26) 9044 * 36 = 325584 27) 2448 * 96 = 235008 28) 7945 * 32 = 254240 29) 2383 * 36 = 85788 30) 5233 * 56 = 293048 31) 2249 * 62 = 139438 32) 5095 * 37 = 188515 33) 1642 * 30 = 49260 34) 5316 * 27 = 143532 35) 8511 * 92 = 783012 36) 5687 * 68 = 386716 37) 7928 * 23 = 182344 38) 2518 * 45 = 113310 39) 8998 * 58 = 521884 40) 8509 * 22 = 187198 41) 3849 * 41 = 157809 42) 7861 * 26 = 204386 43) 5204 * 32 = 166528 44) 6693 * 83 = 555519 45) 8369 * 88 = 736472 46) 7374 * 13 = 95862 47) 2925 * 97 = 283725 48) 4383 * 96 = 420768 49) 4241 * 47 = 199327 50) 8659 * 98 = 848582

Next

Percent worksheets 41

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 41

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 91

Prime numbers Worksheet 91

Percent worksheets 91

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 91

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 91

Factors worksheet91

Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Ratios worksheets 90

Prime numbers Worksheet 90

Percent worksheets 90

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets