1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 42

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 42

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 12, 2020.

Questions

1) 7633 x 74=
2) 2126 x 13=
3) 2505 x 72=
4) 7794 x 26=
5) 5217 x 54=
6) 4060 x 28=
7) 2835 x 69=
8) 7515 x 91=
9) 7261 x 53=
10) 6629 x 70=
11) 5612 x 72=
12) 9604 x 42=
13) 7361 x 52=
14) 5334 x 46=
15) 5024 x 65=
16) 5008 x 47=
17) 6703 x 83=
18) 6709 x 23=
19) 6159 x 60=
20) 1373 x 59=
21) 5668 x 33=
22) 1126 x 72=
23) 2837 x 74=
24) 5705 x 57=
25) 4461 x 68=
26) 6028 x 63=
27) 3099 x 72=
28) 8926 x 67=
29) 5493 x 9=
30) 7499 x 27=
31) 1834 x 29=
32) 8203 x 39=
33) 1467 x 37=
34) 6781 x 84=
35) 2936 x 25=
36) 6730 x 32=
37) 6901 x 62=
38) 7518 x 77=
39) 2785 x 89=
40) 3098 x 75=
41) 7575 x 59=
42) 3194 x 48=
43) 3935 x 60=
44) 3186 x 45=
45) 3583 x 51=
46) 6715 x 29=
47) 2973 x 85=
48) 1204 x 54=
49) 1414 x 28=
50) 4437 x 23=




Answers

1) 7633 * 74 = 564842 2) 2126 * 13 = 27638 3) 2505 * 72 = 180360 4) 7794 * 26 = 202644 5) 5217 * 54 = 281718 6) 4060 * 28 = 113680 7) 2835 * 69 = 195615 8) 7515 * 91 = 683865 9) 7261 * 53 = 384833 10) 6629 * 70 = 464030 11) 5612 * 72 = 404064 12) 9604 * 42 = 403368 13) 7361 * 52 = 382772 14) 5334 * 46 = 245364 15) 5024 * 65 = 326560 16) 5008 * 47 = 235376 17) 6703 * 83 = 556349 18) 6709 * 23 = 154307 19) 6159 * 60 = 369540 20) 1373 * 59 = 81007 21) 5668 * 33 = 187044 22) 1126 * 72 = 81072 23) 2837 * 74 = 209938 24) 5705 * 57 = 325185 25) 4461 * 68 = 303348 26) 6028 * 63 = 379764 27) 3099 * 72 = 223128 28) 8926 * 67 = 598042 29) 5493 * 9 = 49437 30) 7499 * 27 = 202473 31) 1834 * 29 = 53186 32) 8203 * 39 = 319917 33) 1467 * 37 = 54279 34) 6781 * 84 = 569604 35) 2936 * 25 = 73400 36) 6730 * 32 = 215360 37) 6901 * 62 = 427862 38) 7518 * 77 = 578886 39) 2785 * 89 = 247865 40) 3098 * 75 = 232350 41) 7575 * 59 = 446925 42) 3194 * 48 = 153312 43) 3935 * 60 = 236100 44) 3186 * 45 = 143370 45) 3583 * 51 = 182733 46) 6715 * 29 = 194735 47) 2973 * 85 = 252705 48) 1204 * 54 = 65016 49) 1414 * 28 = 39592 50) 4437 * 23 = 102051

Next

Percent worksheets 42

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 42

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 81

Prime numbers Worksheet 81

Percent worksheets 81

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 81

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 81

Factors worksheet81

Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Ratios worksheets 80

Prime numbers Worksheet 80

Percent worksheets 80

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets