1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 44

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 44

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on October 14, 2020.

Questions

1) 6553 x 62=
2) 6012 x 70=
3) 6763 x 23=
4) 1297 x 13=
5) 1867 x 72=
6) 1699 x 61=
7) 1074 x 41=
8) 3705 x 15=
9) 9521 x 64=
10) 7688 x 71=
11) 3887 x 75=
12) 9092 x 58=
13) 4705 x 16=
14) 5008 x 56=
15) 1365 x 27=
16) 2782 x 33=
17) 2506 x 57=
18) 6688 x 59=
19) 8020 x 70=
20) 1650 x 20=
21) 3548 x 30=
22) 6092 x 82=
23) 1377 x 97=
24) 9770 x 96=
25) 5346 x 63=
26) 6052 x 13=
27) 1634 x 85=
28) 2466 x 39=
29) 1431 x 75=
30) 4467 x 10=
31) 7553 x 94=
32) 2900 x 69=
33) 3258 x 93=
34) 2603 x 45=
35) 1576 x 38=
36) 3104 x 58=
37) 6081 x 27=
38) 4828 x 22=
39) 1759 x 65=
40) 1298 x 45=
41) 5281 x 12=
42) 4317 x 98=
43) 3226 x 39=
44) 7504 x 38=
45) 8166 x 69=
46) 7589 x 66=
47) 9866 x 61=
48) 1331 x 65=
49) 3383 x 79=
50) 5324 x 76=




Answers

1) 6553 * 62 = 406286 2) 6012 * 70 = 420840 3) 6763 * 23 = 155549 4) 1297 * 13 = 16861 5) 1867 * 72 = 134424 6) 1699 * 61 = 103639 7) 1074 * 41 = 44034 8) 3705 * 15 = 55575 9) 9521 * 64 = 609344 10) 7688 * 71 = 545848 11) 3887 * 75 = 291525 12) 9092 * 58 = 527336 13) 4705 * 16 = 75280 14) 5008 * 56 = 280448 15) 1365 * 27 = 36855 16) 2782 * 33 = 91806 17) 2506 * 57 = 142842 18) 6688 * 59 = 394592 19) 8020 * 70 = 561400 20) 1650 * 20 = 33000 21) 3548 * 30 = 106440 22) 6092 * 82 = 499544 23) 1377 * 97 = 133569 24) 9770 * 96 = 937920 25) 5346 * 63 = 336798 26) 6052 * 13 = 78676 27) 1634 * 85 = 138890 28) 2466 * 39 = 96174 29) 1431 * 75 = 107325 30) 4467 * 10 = 44670 31) 7553 * 94 = 709982 32) 2900 * 69 = 200100 33) 3258 * 93 = 302994 34) 2603 * 45 = 117135 35) 1576 * 38 = 59888 36) 3104 * 58 = 180032 37) 6081 * 27 = 164187 38) 4828 * 22 = 106216 39) 1759 * 65 = 114335 40) 1298 * 45 = 58410 41) 5281 * 12 = 63372 42) 4317 * 98 = 423066 43) 3226 * 39 = 125814 44) 7504 * 38 = 285152 45) 8166 * 69 = 563454 46) 7589 * 66 = 500874 47) 9866 * 61 = 601826 48) 1331 * 65 = 86515 49) 3383 * 79 = 267257 50) 5324 * 76 = 404624

Next

Percent worksheets 44

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 44

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 91

Prime numbers Worksheet 91

Percent worksheets 91

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 91

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 91

Factors worksheet91

Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Ratios worksheets 90

Prime numbers Worksheet 90

Percent worksheets 90

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets