1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 46

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 46

Last updated on December 3, 2020. Created on October 16, 2020.

Questions

1) 5158 x 62=
2) 8970 x 17=
3) 8161 x 54=
4) 3841 x 33=
5) 1917 x 95=
6) 4655 x 68=
7) 3725 x 14=
8) 7496 x 80=
9) 6872 x 96=
10) 4620 x 87=
11) 7064 x 87=
12) 1243 x 72=
13) 3689 x 33=
14) 9071 x 10=
15) 6317 x 20=
16) 8575 x 91=
17) 3454 x 78=
18) 1816 x 57=
19) 5631 x 52=
20) 8282 x 40=
21) 8078 x 26=
22) 1721 x 62=
23) 7891 x 89=
24) 1370 x 44=
25) 6142 x 18=
26) 6370 x 65=
27) 2952 x 70=
28) 4490 x 68=
29) 4989 x 55=
30) 7868 x 22=
31) 3957 x 9=
32) 6743 x 12=
33) 3122 x 46=
34) 9851 x 88=
35) 9616 x 21=
36) 3849 x 50=
37) 1043 x 33=
38) 2742 x 80=
39) 3709 x 74=
40) 9955 x 89=
41) 9607 x 85=
42) 4600 x 51=
43) 7219 x 62=
44) 7758 x 9=
45) 8873 x 74=
46) 8210 x 42=
47) 4411 x 55=
48) 2410 x 74=
49) 2669 x 70=
50) 5510 x 25=




Answers

1) 5158 * 62 = 319796 2) 8970 * 17 = 152490 3) 8161 * 54 = 440694 4) 3841 * 33 = 126753 5) 1917 * 95 = 182115 6) 4655 * 68 = 316540 7) 3725 * 14 = 52150 8) 7496 * 80 = 599680 9) 6872 * 96 = 659712 10) 4620 * 87 = 401940 11) 7064 * 87 = 614568 12) 1243 * 72 = 89496 13) 3689 * 33 = 121737 14) 9071 * 10 = 90710 15) 6317 * 20 = 126340 16) 8575 * 91 = 780325 17) 3454 * 78 = 269412 18) 1816 * 57 = 103512 19) 5631 * 52 = 292812 20) 8282 * 40 = 331280 21) 8078 * 26 = 210028 22) 1721 * 62 = 106702 23) 7891 * 89 = 702299 24) 1370 * 44 = 60280 25) 6142 * 18 = 110556 26) 6370 * 65 = 414050 27) 2952 * 70 = 206640 28) 4490 * 68 = 305320 29) 4989 * 55 = 274395 30) 7868 * 22 = 173096 31) 3957 * 9 = 35613 32) 6743 * 12 = 80916 33) 3122 * 46 = 143612 34) 9851 * 88 = 866888 35) 9616 * 21 = 201936 36) 3849 * 50 = 192450 37) 1043 * 33 = 34419 38) 2742 * 80 = 219360 39) 3709 * 74 = 274466 40) 9955 * 89 = 885995 41) 9607 * 85 = 816595 42) 4600 * 51 = 234600 43) 7219 * 62 = 447578 44) 7758 * 9 = 69822 45) 8873 * 74 = 656602 46) 8210 * 42 = 344820 47) 4411 * 55 = 242605 48) 2410 * 74 = 178340 49) 2669 * 70 = 186830 50) 5510 * 25 = 137750

Next

Percent worksheets 46

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 46

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 94

Prime numbers Worksheet 94

Percent worksheets 94

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 94

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 94

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 94

Factors worksheet94

Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Ratios worksheets 93

Prime numbers Worksheet 93

Percent worksheets 93

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets