1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 47

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 47

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 17, 2020.

Questions

1) 3655 x 82=
2) 1760 x 79=
3) 8665 x 14=
4) 4657 x 88=
5) 4705 x 84=
6) 5112 x 18=
7) 7773 x 89=
8) 5808 x 18=
9) 6568 x 16=
10) 6134 x 45=
11) 5685 x 78=
12) 4581 x 28=
13) 2934 x 59=
14) 4289 x 27=
15) 8535 x 65=
16) 2370 x 77=
17) 2178 x 95=
18) 8866 x 67=
19) 7558 x 79=
20) 3400 x 11=
21) 5433 x 17=
22) 5423 x 58=
23) 3005 x 43=
24) 6677 x 77=
25) 7252 x 20=
26) 7813 x 28=
27) 7200 x 15=
28) 4865 x 85=
29) 4794 x 80=
30) 1888 x 90=
31) 7855 x 34=
32) 6692 x 73=
33) 7782 x 79=
34) 9026 x 48=
35) 2707 x 51=
36) 4349 x 24=
37) 2354 x 82=
38) 6680 x 65=
39) 3352 x 30=
40) 1936 x 22=
41) 4227 x 90=
42) 1548 x 92=
43) 1070 x 55=
44) 4234 x 50=
45) 7904 x 76=
46) 9897 x 23=
47) 2725 x 73=
48) 3140 x 46=
49) 5783 x 79=
50) 8655 x 45=




Answers

1) 3655 * 82 = 299710 2) 1760 * 79 = 139040 3) 8665 * 14 = 121310 4) 4657 * 88 = 409816 5) 4705 * 84 = 395220 6) 5112 * 18 = 92016 7) 7773 * 89 = 691797 8) 5808 * 18 = 104544 9) 6568 * 16 = 105088 10) 6134 * 45 = 276030 11) 5685 * 78 = 443430 12) 4581 * 28 = 128268 13) 2934 * 59 = 173106 14) 4289 * 27 = 115803 15) 8535 * 65 = 554775 16) 2370 * 77 = 182490 17) 2178 * 95 = 206910 18) 8866 * 67 = 594022 19) 7558 * 79 = 597082 20) 3400 * 11 = 37400 21) 5433 * 17 = 92361 22) 5423 * 58 = 314534 23) 3005 * 43 = 129215 24) 6677 * 77 = 514129 25) 7252 * 20 = 145040 26) 7813 * 28 = 218764 27) 7200 * 15 = 108000 28) 4865 * 85 = 413525 29) 4794 * 80 = 383520 30) 1888 * 90 = 169920 31) 7855 * 34 = 267070 32) 6692 * 73 = 488516 33) 7782 * 79 = 614778 34) 9026 * 48 = 433248 35) 2707 * 51 = 138057 36) 4349 * 24 = 104376 37) 2354 * 82 = 193028 38) 6680 * 65 = 434200 39) 3352 * 30 = 100560 40) 1936 * 22 = 42592 41) 4227 * 90 = 380430 42) 1548 * 92 = 142416 43) 1070 * 55 = 58850 44) 4234 * 50 = 211700 45) 7904 * 76 = 600704 46) 9897 * 23 = 227631 47) 2725 * 73 = 198925 48) 3140 * 46 = 144440 49) 5783 * 79 = 456857 50) 8655 * 45 = 389475

Next

Percent worksheets 47

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 47

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 81

Prime numbers Worksheet 81

Percent worksheets 81

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 81

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 81

Factors worksheet81

Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Ratios worksheets 80

Prime numbers Worksheet 80

Percent worksheets 80

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets