1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 48

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 48

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on October 18, 2020.

Questions

1) 9140 x 89=
2) 2844 x 12=
3) 6599 x 33=
4) 2832 x 69=
5) 7973 x 30=
6) 4249 x 94=
7) 2758 x 37=
8) 1075 x 10=
9) 3204 x 83=
10) 5355 x 67=
11) 4448 x 98=
12) 3442 x 93=
13) 8145 x 58=
14) 8130 x 25=
15) 7901 x 46=
16) 4932 x 70=
17) 8959 x 21=
18) 9523 x 27=
19) 3749 x 50=
20) 6782 x 72=
21) 4687 x 69=
22) 4941 x 92=
23) 5925 x 75=
24) 3217 x 34=
25) 3867 x 17=
26) 9962 x 42=
27) 8774 x 98=
28) 2534 x 11=
29) 3379 x 66=
30) 8908 x 87=
31) 7845 x 97=
32) 1687 x 45=
33) 9844 x 76=
34) 1466 x 52=
35) 6765 x 20=
36) 7724 x 35=
37) 2412 x 58=
38) 3707 x 35=
39) 2956 x 39=
40) 6740 x 73=
41) 6528 x 62=
42) 8903 x 42=
43) 2394 x 25=
44) 9493 x 34=
45) 2119 x 13=
46) 7822 x 27=
47) 4905 x 60=
48) 3202 x 67=
49) 2162 x 9=
50) 5162 x 99=




Answers

1) 9140 * 89 = 813460 2) 2844 * 12 = 34128 3) 6599 * 33 = 217767 4) 2832 * 69 = 195408 5) 7973 * 30 = 239190 6) 4249 * 94 = 399406 7) 2758 * 37 = 102046 8) 1075 * 10 = 10750 9) 3204 * 83 = 265932 10) 5355 * 67 = 358785 11) 4448 * 98 = 435904 12) 3442 * 93 = 320106 13) 8145 * 58 = 472410 14) 8130 * 25 = 203250 15) 7901 * 46 = 363446 16) 4932 * 70 = 345240 17) 8959 * 21 = 188139 18) 9523 * 27 = 257121 19) 3749 * 50 = 187450 20) 6782 * 72 = 488304 21) 4687 * 69 = 323403 22) 4941 * 92 = 454572 23) 5925 * 75 = 444375 24) 3217 * 34 = 109378 25) 3867 * 17 = 65739 26) 9962 * 42 = 418404 27) 8774 * 98 = 859852 28) 2534 * 11 = 27874 29) 3379 * 66 = 223014 30) 8908 * 87 = 774996 31) 7845 * 97 = 760965 32) 1687 * 45 = 75915 33) 9844 * 76 = 748144 34) 1466 * 52 = 76232 35) 6765 * 20 = 135300 36) 7724 * 35 = 270340 37) 2412 * 58 = 139896 38) 3707 * 35 = 129745 39) 2956 * 39 = 115284 40) 6740 * 73 = 492020 41) 6528 * 62 = 404736 42) 8903 * 42 = 373926 43) 2394 * 25 = 59850 44) 9493 * 34 = 322762 45) 2119 * 13 = 27547 46) 7822 * 27 = 211194 47) 4905 * 60 = 294300 48) 3202 * 67 = 214534 49) 2162 * 9 = 19458 50) 5162 * 99 = 511038

Next

Percent worksheets 48

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 48

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 89

Prime numbers Worksheet 89

Percent worksheets 89

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 89

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 89

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 89

Factors worksheet89

Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Ratios worksheets 88

Prime numbers Worksheet 88

Percent worksheets 88

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets