1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 51

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 51

Last updated on December 3, 2020. Created on October 21, 2020.

Questions

1) 2312 x 44=
2) 5927 x 45=
3) 9681 x 79=
4) 6088 x 16=
5) 8697 x 68=
6) 3989 x 39=
7) 8005 x 68=
8) 3784 x 25=
9) 4212 x 91=
10) 2421 x 54=
11) 8785 x 57=
12) 5233 x 69=
13) 9500 x 87=
14) 8158 x 59=
15) 8901 x 47=
16) 7237 x 23=
17) 5560 x 36=
18) 2075 x 62=
19) 4050 x 54=
20) 1456 x 87=
21) 7673 x 37=
22) 3237 x 82=
23) 5833 x 99=
24) 3834 x 19=
25) 9035 x 69=
26) 1839 x 67=
27) 2290 x 31=
28) 3566 x 55=
29) 4727 x 35=
30) 5195 x 40=
31) 4908 x 20=
32) 9433 x 92=
33) 3448 x 66=
34) 2646 x 54=
35) 1578 x 75=
36) 8158 x 98=
37) 7263 x 56=
38) 8742 x 53=
39) 3926 x 86=
40) 1376 x 13=
41) 6426 x 56=
42) 1646 x 54=
43) 4242 x 59=
44) 4851 x 65=
45) 2631 x 37=
46) 4337 x 15=
47) 4705 x 43=
48) 5349 x 34=
49) 9787 x 89=
50) 9913 x 36=




Answers

1) 2312 * 44 = 101728 2) 5927 * 45 = 266715 3) 9681 * 79 = 764799 4) 6088 * 16 = 97408 5) 8697 * 68 = 591396 6) 3989 * 39 = 155571 7) 8005 * 68 = 544340 8) 3784 * 25 = 94600 9) 4212 * 91 = 383292 10) 2421 * 54 = 130734 11) 8785 * 57 = 500745 12) 5233 * 69 = 361077 13) 9500 * 87 = 826500 14) 8158 * 59 = 481322 15) 8901 * 47 = 418347 16) 7237 * 23 = 166451 17) 5560 * 36 = 200160 18) 2075 * 62 = 128650 19) 4050 * 54 = 218700 20) 1456 * 87 = 126672 21) 7673 * 37 = 283901 22) 3237 * 82 = 265434 23) 5833 * 99 = 577467 24) 3834 * 19 = 72846 25) 9035 * 69 = 623415 26) 1839 * 67 = 123213 27) 2290 * 31 = 70990 28) 3566 * 55 = 196130 29) 4727 * 35 = 165445 30) 5195 * 40 = 207800 31) 4908 * 20 = 98160 32) 9433 * 92 = 867836 33) 3448 * 66 = 227568 34) 2646 * 54 = 142884 35) 1578 * 75 = 118350 36) 8158 * 98 = 799484 37) 7263 * 56 = 406728 38) 8742 * 53 = 463326 39) 3926 * 86 = 337636 40) 1376 * 13 = 17888 41) 6426 * 56 = 359856 42) 1646 * 54 = 88884 43) 4242 * 59 = 250278 44) 4851 * 65 = 315315 45) 2631 * 37 = 97347 46) 4337 * 15 = 65055 47) 4705 * 43 = 202315 48) 5349 * 34 = 181866 49) 9787 * 89 = 871043 50) 9913 * 36 = 356868

Next

Percent worksheets 51

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 51

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 94

Prime numbers Worksheet 94

Percent worksheets 94

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 94

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 94

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 94

Factors worksheet94

Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Ratios worksheets 93

Prime numbers Worksheet 93

Percent worksheets 93

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets