1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 52

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 52

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on October 22, 2020.

Questions

1) 4537 x 13=
2) 8260 x 98=
3) 1651 x 14=
4) 1728 x 40=
5) 1732 x 59=
6) 7146 x 59=
7) 3429 x 87=
8) 7377 x 63=
9) 2444 x 45=
10) 3160 x 33=
11) 3161 x 84=
12) 2642 x 40=
13) 5436 x 51=
14) 9038 x 97=
15) 7956 x 24=
16) 4956 x 91=
17) 4284 x 15=
18) 5409 x 26=
19) 5357 x 30=
20) 2739 x 29=
21) 5082 x 60=
22) 7821 x 89=
23) 5318 x 75=
24) 4189 x 22=
25) 9320 x 34=
26) 5999 x 28=
27) 7292 x 22=
28) 2294 x 46=
29) 7425 x 17=
30) 6444 x 11=
31) 7452 x 29=
32) 6939 x 57=
33) 2302 x 63=
34) 3419 x 25=
35) 1730 x 72=
36) 4444 x 15=
37) 2139 x 32=
38) 7356 x 66=
39) 2875 x 47=
40) 2998 x 29=
41) 5048 x 45=
42) 7824 x 66=
43) 1510 x 73=
44) 1105 x 14=
45) 3216 x 13=
46) 9234 x 25=
47) 9424 x 37=
48) 2831 x 35=
49) 1417 x 67=
50) 5647 x 31=




Answers

1) 4537 * 13 = 58981 2) 8260 * 98 = 809480 3) 1651 * 14 = 23114 4) 1728 * 40 = 69120 5) 1732 * 59 = 102188 6) 7146 * 59 = 421614 7) 3429 * 87 = 298323 8) 7377 * 63 = 464751 9) 2444 * 45 = 109980 10) 3160 * 33 = 104280 11) 3161 * 84 = 265524 12) 2642 * 40 = 105680 13) 5436 * 51 = 277236 14) 9038 * 97 = 876686 15) 7956 * 24 = 190944 16) 4956 * 91 = 450996 17) 4284 * 15 = 64260 18) 5409 * 26 = 140634 19) 5357 * 30 = 160710 20) 2739 * 29 = 79431 21) 5082 * 60 = 304920 22) 7821 * 89 = 696069 23) 5318 * 75 = 398850 24) 4189 * 22 = 92158 25) 9320 * 34 = 316880 26) 5999 * 28 = 167972 27) 7292 * 22 = 160424 28) 2294 * 46 = 105524 29) 7425 * 17 = 126225 30) 6444 * 11 = 70884 31) 7452 * 29 = 216108 32) 6939 * 57 = 395523 33) 2302 * 63 = 145026 34) 3419 * 25 = 85475 35) 1730 * 72 = 124560 36) 4444 * 15 = 66660 37) 2139 * 32 = 68448 38) 7356 * 66 = 485496 39) 2875 * 47 = 135125 40) 2998 * 29 = 86942 41) 5048 * 45 = 227160 42) 7824 * 66 = 516384 43) 1510 * 73 = 110230 44) 1105 * 14 = 15470 45) 3216 * 13 = 41808 46) 9234 * 25 = 230850 47) 9424 * 37 = 348688 48) 2831 * 35 = 99085 49) 1417 * 67 = 94939 50) 5647 * 31 = 175057

Next

Percent worksheets 52

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 52

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 91

Prime numbers Worksheet 91

Percent worksheets 91

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 91

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 91

Factors worksheet91

Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Ratios worksheets 90

Prime numbers Worksheet 90

Percent worksheets 90

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets