1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 53

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 53

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 23, 2020.

Questions

1) 7661 x 48=
2) 1022 x 84=
3) 4493 x 56=
4) 7992 x 41=
5) 9779 x 37=
6) 2762 x 96=
7) 8869 x 95=
8) 1593 x 91=
9) 8561 x 39=
10) 5549 x 42=
11) 6017 x 69=
12) 9390 x 29=
13) 3869 x 96=
14) 9560 x 26=
15) 8605 x 89=
16) 2772 x 68=
17) 9843 x 48=
18) 7875 x 87=
19) 1956 x 50=
20) 7548 x 9=
21) 2845 x 83=
22) 8031 x 34=
23) 9882 x 20=
24) 7566 x 11=
25) 2155 x 9=
26) 5774 x 70=
27) 9104 x 27=
28) 1195 x 69=
29) 4079 x 64=
30) 5244 x 92=
31) 6722 x 83=
32) 5283 x 15=
33) 4328 x 90=
34) 3341 x 79=
35) 1573 x 32=
36) 1764 x 77=
37) 7050 x 56=
38) 5750 x 30=
39) 1592 x 99=
40) 2139 x 36=
41) 8589 x 17=
42) 2778 x 41=
43) 6893 x 53=
44) 7028 x 34=
45) 5264 x 56=
46) 6876 x 59=
47) 8332 x 59=
48) 7771 x 26=
49) 1352 x 22=
50) 4458 x 61=




Answers

1) 7661 * 48 = 367728 2) 1022 * 84 = 85848 3) 4493 * 56 = 251608 4) 7992 * 41 = 327672 5) 9779 * 37 = 361823 6) 2762 * 96 = 265152 7) 8869 * 95 = 842555 8) 1593 * 91 = 144963 9) 8561 * 39 = 333879 10) 5549 * 42 = 233058 11) 6017 * 69 = 415173 12) 9390 * 29 = 272310 13) 3869 * 96 = 371424 14) 9560 * 26 = 248560 15) 8605 * 89 = 765845 16) 2772 * 68 = 188496 17) 9843 * 48 = 472464 18) 7875 * 87 = 685125 19) 1956 * 50 = 97800 20) 7548 * 9 = 67932 21) 2845 * 83 = 236135 22) 8031 * 34 = 273054 23) 9882 * 20 = 197640 24) 7566 * 11 = 83226 25) 2155 * 9 = 19395 26) 5774 * 70 = 404180 27) 9104 * 27 = 245808 28) 1195 * 69 = 82455 29) 4079 * 64 = 261056 30) 5244 * 92 = 482448 31) 6722 * 83 = 557926 32) 5283 * 15 = 79245 33) 4328 * 90 = 389520 34) 3341 * 79 = 263939 35) 1573 * 32 = 50336 36) 1764 * 77 = 135828 37) 7050 * 56 = 394800 38) 5750 * 30 = 172500 39) 1592 * 99 = 157608 40) 2139 * 36 = 77004 41) 8589 * 17 = 146013 42) 2778 * 41 = 113898 43) 6893 * 53 = 365329 44) 7028 * 34 = 238952 45) 5264 * 56 = 294784 46) 6876 * 59 = 405684 47) 8332 * 59 = 491588 48) 7771 * 26 = 202046 49) 1352 * 22 = 29744 50) 4458 * 61 = 271938

Next

Percent worksheets 53

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 53

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 81

Prime numbers Worksheet 81

Percent worksheets 81

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 81

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 81

Factors worksheet81

Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Ratios worksheets 80

Prime numbers Worksheet 80

Percent worksheets 80

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets