1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 54

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 54

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 24, 2020.

Questions

1) 1609 x 26=
2) 7629 x 33=
3) 3785 x 51=
4) 7480 x 23=
5) 6000 x 21=
6) 4099 x 66=
7) 5760 x 56=
8) 8023 x 61=
9) 1932 x 72=
10) 8275 x 15=
11) 1305 x 85=
12) 4659 x 76=
13) 5114 x 56=
14) 9961 x 21=
15) 2193 x 58=
16) 6580 x 84=
17) 8574 x 38=
18) 3153 x 97=
19) 5401 x 83=
20) 8964 x 22=
21) 6740 x 75=
22) 5538 x 78=
23) 8498 x 51=
24) 4994 x 74=
25) 1625 x 91=
26) 4096 x 48=
27) 4035 x 19=
28) 7797 x 60=
29) 2948 x 99=
30) 2100 x 30=
31) 6754 x 73=
32) 1637 x 51=
33) 7369 x 98=
34) 1692 x 22=
35) 1363 x 74=
36) 6379 x 45=
37) 8697 x 15=
38) 9373 x 17=
39) 5459 x 14=
40) 6076 x 95=
41) 4573 x 81=
42) 5873 x 81=
43) 6405 x 61=
44) 9589 x 50=
45) 4975 x 64=
46) 4410 x 73=
47) 2138 x 38=
48) 2852 x 97=
49) 4060 x 17=
50) 6682 x 29=




Answers

1) 1609 * 26 = 41834 2) 7629 * 33 = 251757 3) 3785 * 51 = 193035 4) 7480 * 23 = 172040 5) 6000 * 21 = 126000 6) 4099 * 66 = 270534 7) 5760 * 56 = 322560 8) 8023 * 61 = 489403 9) 1932 * 72 = 139104 10) 8275 * 15 = 124125 11) 1305 * 85 = 110925 12) 4659 * 76 = 354084 13) 5114 * 56 = 286384 14) 9961 * 21 = 209181 15) 2193 * 58 = 127194 16) 6580 * 84 = 552720 17) 8574 * 38 = 325812 18) 3153 * 97 = 305841 19) 5401 * 83 = 448283 20) 8964 * 22 = 197208 21) 6740 * 75 = 505500 22) 5538 * 78 = 431964 23) 8498 * 51 = 433398 24) 4994 * 74 = 369556 25) 1625 * 91 = 147875 26) 4096 * 48 = 196608 27) 4035 * 19 = 76665 28) 7797 * 60 = 467820 29) 2948 * 99 = 291852 30) 2100 * 30 = 63000 31) 6754 * 73 = 493042 32) 1637 * 51 = 83487 33) 7369 * 98 = 722162 34) 1692 * 22 = 37224 35) 1363 * 74 = 100862 36) 6379 * 45 = 287055 37) 8697 * 15 = 130455 38) 9373 * 17 = 159341 39) 5459 * 14 = 76426 40) 6076 * 95 = 577220 41) 4573 * 81 = 370413 42) 5873 * 81 = 475713 43) 6405 * 61 = 390705 44) 9589 * 50 = 479450 45) 4975 * 64 = 318400 46) 4410 * 73 = 321930 47) 2138 * 38 = 81244 48) 2852 * 97 = 276644 49) 4060 * 17 = 69020 50) 6682 * 29 = 193778

Next

Percent worksheets 54

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 54

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 81

Prime numbers Worksheet 81

Percent worksheets 81

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 81

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 81

Factors worksheet81

Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Ratios worksheets 80

Prime numbers Worksheet 80

Percent worksheets 80

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets