1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 56

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 56

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on October 26, 2020.

Questions

1) 9889 x 19=
2) 1338 x 10=
3) 6003 x 22=
4) 6004 x 44=
5) 1116 x 56=
6) 6622 x 94=
7) 6219 x 70=
8) 6500 x 32=
9) 4899 x 40=
10) 2465 x 69=
11) 7231 x 24=
12) 6258 x 49=
13) 8047 x 80=
14) 2109 x 58=
15) 9687 x 44=
16) 1383 x 49=
17) 9523 x 69=
18) 7194 x 15=
19) 2397 x 31=
20) 9143 x 74=
21) 1264 x 84=
22) 9734 x 52=
23) 9623 x 75=
24) 1266 x 92=
25) 6867 x 27=
26) 1986 x 36=
27) 4520 x 37=
28) 5351 x 80=
29) 9821 x 13=
30) 8015 x 90=
31) 1202 x 81=
32) 4252 x 78=
33) 7231 x 15=
34) 8150 x 11=
35) 4190 x 46=
36) 6147 x 70=
37) 9196 x 99=
38) 6561 x 76=
39) 2578 x 62=
40) 1312 x 56=
41) 3722 x 56=
42) 2641 x 65=
43) 6232 x 23=
44) 7658 x 21=
45) 8128 x 79=
46) 9793 x 72=
47) 2623 x 45=
48) 8247 x 34=
49) 7700 x 61=
50) 5556 x 93=




Answers

1) 9889 * 19 = 187891 2) 1338 * 10 = 13380 3) 6003 * 22 = 132066 4) 6004 * 44 = 264176 5) 1116 * 56 = 62496 6) 6622 * 94 = 622468 7) 6219 * 70 = 435330 8) 6500 * 32 = 208000 9) 4899 * 40 = 195960 10) 2465 * 69 = 170085 11) 7231 * 24 = 173544 12) 6258 * 49 = 306642 13) 8047 * 80 = 643760 14) 2109 * 58 = 122322 15) 9687 * 44 = 426228 16) 1383 * 49 = 67767 17) 9523 * 69 = 657087 18) 7194 * 15 = 107910 19) 2397 * 31 = 74307 20) 9143 * 74 = 676582 21) 1264 * 84 = 106176 22) 9734 * 52 = 506168 23) 9623 * 75 = 721725 24) 1266 * 92 = 116472 25) 6867 * 27 = 185409 26) 1986 * 36 = 71496 27) 4520 * 37 = 167240 28) 5351 * 80 = 428080 29) 9821 * 13 = 127673 30) 8015 * 90 = 721350 31) 1202 * 81 = 97362 32) 4252 * 78 = 331656 33) 7231 * 15 = 108465 34) 8150 * 11 = 89650 35) 4190 * 46 = 192740 36) 6147 * 70 = 430290 37) 9196 * 99 = 910404 38) 6561 * 76 = 498636 39) 2578 * 62 = 159836 40) 1312 * 56 = 73472 41) 3722 * 56 = 208432 42) 2641 * 65 = 171665 43) 6232 * 23 = 143336 44) 7658 * 21 = 160818 45) 8128 * 79 = 642112 46) 9793 * 72 = 705096 47) 2623 * 45 = 118035 48) 8247 * 34 = 280398 49) 7700 * 61 = 469700 50) 5556 * 93 = 516708

Next

Percent worksheets 56

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 56

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 89

Prime numbers Worksheet 89

Percent worksheets 89

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 89

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 89

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 89

Factors worksheet89

Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Ratios worksheets 88

Prime numbers Worksheet 88

Percent worksheets 88

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets