1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 57

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 57

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 27, 2020.

Questions

1) 7026 x 63=
2) 6709 x 46=
3) 3342 x 18=
4) 2099 x 26=
5) 6107 x 72=
6) 1860 x 41=
7) 1532 x 66=
8) 6299 x 37=
9) 6757 x 20=
10) 3282 x 95=
11) 4823 x 53=
12) 3867 x 80=
13) 3334 x 34=
14) 9232 x 47=
15) 1790 x 22=
16) 7212 x 48=
17) 9992 x 22=
18) 5793 x 95=
19) 8909 x 12=
20) 2275 x 48=
21) 1153 x 42=
22) 3594 x 85=
23) 5429 x 88=
24) 8660 x 9=
25) 3038 x 76=
26) 5461 x 77=
27) 4357 x 28=
28) 9111 x 59=
29) 2036 x 89=
30) 6115 x 10=
31) 7349 x 86=
32) 3455 x 36=
33) 7318 x 80=
34) 7410 x 20=
35) 6570 x 72=
36) 4126 x 73=
37) 3965 x 71=
38) 1462 x 75=
39) 3619 x 49=
40) 2453 x 23=
41) 3594 x 71=
42) 2346 x 32=
43) 1239 x 39=
44) 5296 x 43=
45) 2517 x 83=
46) 7211 x 51=
47) 3461 x 79=
48) 6693 x 25=
49) 2251 x 45=
50) 8849 x 26=




Answers

1) 7026 * 63 = 442638 2) 6709 * 46 = 308614 3) 3342 * 18 = 60156 4) 2099 * 26 = 54574 5) 6107 * 72 = 439704 6) 1860 * 41 = 76260 7) 1532 * 66 = 101112 8) 6299 * 37 = 233063 9) 6757 * 20 = 135140 10) 3282 * 95 = 311790 11) 4823 * 53 = 255619 12) 3867 * 80 = 309360 13) 3334 * 34 = 113356 14) 9232 * 47 = 433904 15) 1790 * 22 = 39380 16) 7212 * 48 = 346176 17) 9992 * 22 = 219824 18) 5793 * 95 = 550335 19) 8909 * 12 = 106908 20) 2275 * 48 = 109200 21) 1153 * 42 = 48426 22) 3594 * 85 = 305490 23) 5429 * 88 = 477752 24) 8660 * 9 = 77940 25) 3038 * 76 = 230888 26) 5461 * 77 = 420497 27) 4357 * 28 = 121996 28) 9111 * 59 = 537549 29) 2036 * 89 = 181204 30) 6115 * 10 = 61150 31) 7349 * 86 = 632014 32) 3455 * 36 = 124380 33) 7318 * 80 = 585440 34) 7410 * 20 = 148200 35) 6570 * 72 = 473040 36) 4126 * 73 = 301198 37) 3965 * 71 = 281515 38) 1462 * 75 = 109650 39) 3619 * 49 = 177331 40) 2453 * 23 = 56419 41) 3594 * 71 = 255174 42) 2346 * 32 = 75072 43) 1239 * 39 = 48321 44) 5296 * 43 = 227728 45) 2517 * 83 = 208911 46) 7211 * 51 = 367761 47) 3461 * 79 = 273419 48) 6693 * 25 = 167325 49) 2251 * 45 = 101295 50) 8849 * 26 = 230074

Next

Percent worksheets 57

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 57

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 81

Prime numbers Worksheet 81

Percent worksheets 81

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 81

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 81

Factors worksheet81

Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Ratios worksheets 80

Prime numbers Worksheet 80

Percent worksheets 80

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets