1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 59

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 59

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on October 29, 2020.

Questions

1) 3226 x 26=
2) 2212 x 72=
3) 7566 x 42=
4) 1837 x 23=
5) 8380 x 79=
6) 2144 x 58=
7) 5900 x 25=
8) 4570 x 52=
9) 6926 x 40=
10) 6115 x 65=
11) 9206 x 78=
12) 5770 x 96=
13) 9748 x 84=
14) 9050 x 34=
15) 8059 x 40=
16) 9231 x 16=
17) 1518 x 35=
18) 2264 x 16=
19) 7933 x 65=
20) 4925 x 48=
21) 9548 x 51=
22) 4719 x 58=
23) 2216 x 54=
24) 5530 x 68=
25) 4751 x 92=
26) 4478 x 97=
27) 2480 x 42=
28) 6478 x 23=
29) 3809 x 89=
30) 6750 x 39=
31) 4006 x 81=
32) 9354 x 17=
33) 6504 x 55=
34) 6629 x 76=
35) 5268 x 41=
36) 3585 x 46=
37) 1851 x 77=
38) 5536 x 27=
39) 2120 x 71=
40) 1428 x 92=
41) 9116 x 15=
42) 9917 x 70=
43) 1898 x 15=
44) 8860 x 22=
45) 6930 x 71=
46) 6707 x 85=
47) 1866 x 71=
48) 5768 x 43=
49) 7466 x 49=
50) 4090 x 54=




Answers

1) 3226 * 26 = 83876 2) 2212 * 72 = 159264 3) 7566 * 42 = 317772 4) 1837 * 23 = 42251 5) 8380 * 79 = 662020 6) 2144 * 58 = 124352 7) 5900 * 25 = 147500 8) 4570 * 52 = 237640 9) 6926 * 40 = 277040 10) 6115 * 65 = 397475 11) 9206 * 78 = 718068 12) 5770 * 96 = 553920 13) 9748 * 84 = 818832 14) 9050 * 34 = 307700 15) 8059 * 40 = 322360 16) 9231 * 16 = 147696 17) 1518 * 35 = 53130 18) 2264 * 16 = 36224 19) 7933 * 65 = 515645 20) 4925 * 48 = 236400 21) 9548 * 51 = 486948 22) 4719 * 58 = 273702 23) 2216 * 54 = 119664 24) 5530 * 68 = 376040 25) 4751 * 92 = 437092 26) 4478 * 97 = 434366 27) 2480 * 42 = 104160 28) 6478 * 23 = 148994 29) 3809 * 89 = 339001 30) 6750 * 39 = 263250 31) 4006 * 81 = 324486 32) 9354 * 17 = 159018 33) 6504 * 55 = 357720 34) 6629 * 76 = 503804 35) 5268 * 41 = 215988 36) 3585 * 46 = 164910 37) 1851 * 77 = 142527 38) 5536 * 27 = 149472 39) 2120 * 71 = 150520 40) 1428 * 92 = 131376 41) 9116 * 15 = 136740 42) 9917 * 70 = 694190 43) 1898 * 15 = 28470 44) 8860 * 22 = 194920 45) 6930 * 71 = 492030 46) 6707 * 85 = 570095 47) 1866 * 71 = 132486 48) 5768 * 43 = 248024 49) 7466 * 49 = 365834 50) 4090 * 54 = 220860

Next

Percent worksheets 59

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 59

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 91

Prime numbers Worksheet 91

Percent worksheets 91

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 91

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 91

Factors worksheet91

Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Ratios worksheets 90

Prime numbers Worksheet 90

Percent worksheets 90

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets