1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 60

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 60

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 30, 2020.

Questions

1) 5520 x 67=
2) 2465 x 14=
3) 2319 x 75=
4) 3955 x 69=
5) 5044 x 39=
6) 7402 x 89=
7) 9683 x 87=
8) 2248 x 97=
9) 8707 x 99=
10) 9321 x 46=
11) 7915 x 57=
12) 3895 x 55=
13) 9659 x 40=
14) 2183 x 29=
15) 6782 x 61=
16) 5873 x 82=
17) 4736 x 9=
18) 7920 x 58=
19) 4265 x 11=
20) 8675 x 75=
21) 7033 x 93=
22) 6021 x 22=
23) 5475 x 45=
24) 7176 x 80=
25) 9675 x 17=
26) 4782 x 87=
27) 3422 x 72=
28) 7176 x 86=
29) 3895 x 61=
30) 1352 x 42=
31) 5460 x 62=
32) 6656 x 95=
33) 7800 x 28=
34) 3659 x 37=
35) 1736 x 63=
36) 3630 x 98=
37) 1139 x 30=
38) 7190 x 94=
39) 1686 x 38=
40) 5144 x 89=
41) 2158 x 65=
42) 9691 x 49=
43) 1452 x 79=
44) 3655 x 61=
45) 8646 x 67=
46) 3676 x 66=
47) 3137 x 16=
48) 1723 x 90=
49) 4172 x 16=
50) 8362 x 78=




Answers

1) 5520 * 67 = 369840 2) 2465 * 14 = 34510 3) 2319 * 75 = 173925 4) 3955 * 69 = 272895 5) 5044 * 39 = 196716 6) 7402 * 89 = 658778 7) 9683 * 87 = 842421 8) 2248 * 97 = 218056 9) 8707 * 99 = 861993 10) 9321 * 46 = 428766 11) 7915 * 57 = 451155 12) 3895 * 55 = 214225 13) 9659 * 40 = 386360 14) 2183 * 29 = 63307 15) 6782 * 61 = 413702 16) 5873 * 82 = 481586 17) 4736 * 9 = 42624 18) 7920 * 58 = 459360 19) 4265 * 11 = 46915 20) 8675 * 75 = 650625 21) 7033 * 93 = 654069 22) 6021 * 22 = 132462 23) 5475 * 45 = 246375 24) 7176 * 80 = 574080 25) 9675 * 17 = 164475 26) 4782 * 87 = 416034 27) 3422 * 72 = 246384 28) 7176 * 86 = 617136 29) 3895 * 61 = 237595 30) 1352 * 42 = 56784 31) 5460 * 62 = 338520 32) 6656 * 95 = 632320 33) 7800 * 28 = 218400 34) 3659 * 37 = 135383 35) 1736 * 63 = 109368 36) 3630 * 98 = 355740 37) 1139 * 30 = 34170 38) 7190 * 94 = 675860 39) 1686 * 38 = 64068 40) 5144 * 89 = 457816 41) 2158 * 65 = 140270 42) 9691 * 49 = 474859 43) 1452 * 79 = 114708 44) 3655 * 61 = 222955 45) 8646 * 67 = 579282 46) 3676 * 66 = 242616 47) 3137 * 16 = 50192 48) 1723 * 90 = 155070 49) 4172 * 16 = 66752 50) 8362 * 78 = 652236

Next

Percent worksheets 60

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 60

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 81

Prime numbers Worksheet 81

Percent worksheets 81

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 81

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 81

Factors worksheet81

Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Ratios worksheets 80

Prime numbers Worksheet 80

Percent worksheets 80

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets