1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 62

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 62

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on November 1, 2020.

Questions

1) 3840 x 86=
2) 5419 x 52=
3) 8202 x 21=
4) 1779 x 19=
5) 4931 x 57=
6) 3259 x 66=
7) 1080 x 46=
8) 9719 x 21=
9) 3973 x 77=
10) 7813 x 47=
11) 7704 x 16=
12) 6845 x 68=
13) 6523 x 72=
14) 3931 x 32=
15) 4311 x 21=
16) 5543 x 15=
17) 3205 x 86=
18) 1799 x 26=
19) 5510 x 99=
20) 8043 x 31=
21) 8950 x 40=
22) 6733 x 72=
23) 6833 x 29=
24) 5145 x 98=
25) 1786 x 69=
26) 8980 x 53=
27) 1264 x 95=
28) 7128 x 38=
29) 7456 x 26=
30) 2911 x 79=
31) 4403 x 25=
32) 4085 x 57=
33) 7122 x 27=
34) 1446 x 12=
35) 7407 x 13=
36) 7456 x 24=
37) 6344 x 17=
38) 2778 x 88=
39) 7943 x 26=
40) 9715 x 70=
41) 7677 x 65=
42) 3018 x 11=
43) 1036 x 91=
44) 5941 x 95=
45) 9659 x 59=
46) 7400 x 93=
47) 3985 x 22=
48) 8391 x 73=
49) 9751 x 13=
50) 9627 x 59=




Answers

1) 3840 * 86 = 330240 2) 5419 * 52 = 281788 3) 8202 * 21 = 172242 4) 1779 * 19 = 33801 5) 4931 * 57 = 281067 6) 3259 * 66 = 215094 7) 1080 * 46 = 49680 8) 9719 * 21 = 204099 9) 3973 * 77 = 305921 10) 7813 * 47 = 367211 11) 7704 * 16 = 123264 12) 6845 * 68 = 465460 13) 6523 * 72 = 469656 14) 3931 * 32 = 125792 15) 4311 * 21 = 90531 16) 5543 * 15 = 83145 17) 3205 * 86 = 275630 18) 1799 * 26 = 46774 19) 5510 * 99 = 545490 20) 8043 * 31 = 249333 21) 8950 * 40 = 358000 22) 6733 * 72 = 484776 23) 6833 * 29 = 198157 24) 5145 * 98 = 504210 25) 1786 * 69 = 123234 26) 8980 * 53 = 475940 27) 1264 * 95 = 120080 28) 7128 * 38 = 270864 29) 7456 * 26 = 193856 30) 2911 * 79 = 229969 31) 4403 * 25 = 110075 32) 4085 * 57 = 232845 33) 7122 * 27 = 192294 34) 1446 * 12 = 17352 35) 7407 * 13 = 96291 36) 7456 * 24 = 178944 37) 6344 * 17 = 107848 38) 2778 * 88 = 244464 39) 7943 * 26 = 206518 40) 9715 * 70 = 680050 41) 7677 * 65 = 499005 42) 3018 * 11 = 33198 43) 1036 * 91 = 94276 44) 5941 * 95 = 564395 45) 9659 * 59 = 569881 46) 7400 * 93 = 688200 47) 3985 * 22 = 87670 48) 8391 * 73 = 612543 49) 9751 * 13 = 126763 50) 9627 * 59 = 567993

Next

Percent worksheets 62

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 62

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 81

Prime numbers Worksheet 81

Percent worksheets 81

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 81

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 81

Factors worksheet81

Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Ratios worksheets 80

Prime numbers Worksheet 80

Percent worksheets 80

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets