1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 64

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 64

Last updated on December 3, 2020. Created on November 3, 2020.

Questions

1) 7763 x 98=
2) 8033 x 48=
3) 8721 x 75=
4) 3261 x 57=
5) 1224 x 43=
6) 9601 x 88=
7) 6971 x 54=
8) 6273 x 49=
9) 9440 x 95=
10) 8408 x 38=
11) 4675 x 15=
12) 5424 x 98=
13) 3830 x 90=
14) 2227 x 65=
15) 6262 x 9=
16) 6363 x 96=
17) 7373 x 88=
18) 6729 x 41=
19) 2091 x 55=
20) 3151 x 93=
21) 2583 x 34=
22) 8837 x 11=
23) 6803 x 58=
24) 8860 x 62=
25) 7293 x 15=
26) 6660 x 62=
27) 9955 x 33=
28) 9653 x 46=
29) 4912 x 19=
30) 6252 x 93=
31) 8328 x 48=
32) 8458 x 35=
33) 9173 x 66=
34) 8077 x 32=
35) 3654 x 22=
36) 7001 x 61=
37) 5336 x 77=
38) 2256 x 31=
39) 2888 x 23=
40) 4040 x 38=
41) 4713 x 9=
42) 3152 x 43=
43) 6995 x 47=
44) 8692 x 60=
45) 5742 x 38=
46) 1068 x 41=
47) 8945 x 89=
48) 5224 x 40=
49) 4846 x 44=
50) 8055 x 33=




Answers

1) 7763 * 98 = 760774 2) 8033 * 48 = 385584 3) 8721 * 75 = 654075 4) 3261 * 57 = 185877 5) 1224 * 43 = 52632 6) 9601 * 88 = 844888 7) 6971 * 54 = 376434 8) 6273 * 49 = 307377 9) 9440 * 95 = 896800 10) 8408 * 38 = 319504 11) 4675 * 15 = 70125 12) 5424 * 98 = 531552 13) 3830 * 90 = 344700 14) 2227 * 65 = 144755 15) 6262 * 9 = 56358 16) 6363 * 96 = 610848 17) 7373 * 88 = 648824 18) 6729 * 41 = 275889 19) 2091 * 55 = 115005 20) 3151 * 93 = 293043 21) 2583 * 34 = 87822 22) 8837 * 11 = 97207 23) 6803 * 58 = 394574 24) 8860 * 62 = 549320 25) 7293 * 15 = 109395 26) 6660 * 62 = 412920 27) 9955 * 33 = 328515 28) 9653 * 46 = 444038 29) 4912 * 19 = 93328 30) 6252 * 93 = 581436 31) 8328 * 48 = 399744 32) 8458 * 35 = 296030 33) 9173 * 66 = 605418 34) 8077 * 32 = 258464 35) 3654 * 22 = 80388 36) 7001 * 61 = 427061 37) 5336 * 77 = 410872 38) 2256 * 31 = 69936 39) 2888 * 23 = 66424 40) 4040 * 38 = 153520 41) 4713 * 9 = 42417 42) 3152 * 43 = 135536 43) 6995 * 47 = 328765 44) 8692 * 60 = 521520 45) 5742 * 38 = 218196 46) 1068 * 41 = 43788 47) 8945 * 89 = 796105 48) 5224 * 40 = 208960 49) 4846 * 44 = 213224 50) 8055 * 33 = 265815

Next

Percent worksheets 64

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 64

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 94

Prime numbers Worksheet 94

Percent worksheets 94

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 94

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 94

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 94

Factors worksheet94

Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Ratios worksheets 93

Prime numbers Worksheet 93

Percent worksheets 93

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets