1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 65

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 65

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on November 4, 2020.

Questions

1) 3041 x 19=
2) 3565 x 21=
3) 8856 x 75=
4) 2111 x 35=
5) 2114 x 67=
6) 5479 x 41=
7) 7613 x 67=
8) 7670 x 99=
9) 2300 x 77=
10) 2330 x 26=
11) 7513 x 93=
12) 5477 x 12=
13) 6179 x 14=
14) 8746 x 44=
15) 4638 x 47=
16) 1179 x 54=
17) 6959 x 14=
18) 8572 x 38=
19) 7073 x 79=
20) 9762 x 29=
21) 6634 x 44=
22) 3015 x 70=
23) 1289 x 30=
24) 3731 x 22=
25) 2284 x 36=
26) 9426 x 16=
27) 5852 x 58=
28) 7975 x 42=
29) 3211 x 46=
30) 2830 x 70=
31) 7544 x 62=
32) 5905 x 39=
33) 3686 x 25=
34) 6935 x 71=
35) 8420 x 89=
36) 3143 x 43=
37) 4580 x 64=
38) 1545 x 25=
39) 5436 x 81=
40) 7045 x 55=
41) 9867 x 76=
42) 7166 x 51=
43) 8098 x 41=
44) 3873 x 63=
45) 5634 x 29=
46) 2662 x 18=
47) 8677 x 50=
48) 1096 x 62=
49) 5770 x 65=
50) 5996 x 81=




Answers

1) 3041 * 19 = 57779 2) 3565 * 21 = 74865 3) 8856 * 75 = 664200 4) 2111 * 35 = 73885 5) 2114 * 67 = 141638 6) 5479 * 41 = 224639 7) 7613 * 67 = 510071 8) 7670 * 99 = 759330 9) 2300 * 77 = 177100 10) 2330 * 26 = 60580 11) 7513 * 93 = 698709 12) 5477 * 12 = 65724 13) 6179 * 14 = 86506 14) 8746 * 44 = 384824 15) 4638 * 47 = 217986 16) 1179 * 54 = 63666 17) 6959 * 14 = 97426 18) 8572 * 38 = 325736 19) 7073 * 79 = 558767 20) 9762 * 29 = 283098 21) 6634 * 44 = 291896 22) 3015 * 70 = 211050 23) 1289 * 30 = 38670 24) 3731 * 22 = 82082 25) 2284 * 36 = 82224 26) 9426 * 16 = 150816 27) 5852 * 58 = 339416 28) 7975 * 42 = 334950 29) 3211 * 46 = 147706 30) 2830 * 70 = 198100 31) 7544 * 62 = 467728 32) 5905 * 39 = 230295 33) 3686 * 25 = 92150 34) 6935 * 71 = 492385 35) 8420 * 89 = 749380 36) 3143 * 43 = 135149 37) 4580 * 64 = 293120 38) 1545 * 25 = 38625 39) 5436 * 81 = 440316 40) 7045 * 55 = 387475 41) 9867 * 76 = 749892 42) 7166 * 51 = 365466 43) 8098 * 41 = 332018 44) 3873 * 63 = 243999 45) 5634 * 29 = 163386 46) 2662 * 18 = 47916 47) 8677 * 50 = 433850 48) 1096 * 62 = 67952 49) 5770 * 65 = 375050 50) 5996 * 81 = 485676

Next

Percent worksheets 65

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 65

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 91

Prime numbers Worksheet 91

Percent worksheets 91

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 91

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 91

Factors worksheet91

Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Ratios worksheets 90

Prime numbers Worksheet 90

Percent worksheets 90

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets