JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 68

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 68

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on November 7, 2020.

Questions

1) 3464 x 89=
2) 5002 x 53=
3) 7898 x 28=
4) 3038 x 53=
5) 7175 x 61=
6) 2557 x 15=
7) 4357 x 91=
8) 3673 x 93=
9) 4004 x 71=
10) 1298 x 78=
11) 2770 x 88=
12) 7337 x 21=
13) 5229 x 30=
14) 4188 x 91=
15) 5924 x 41=
16) 3893 x 54=
17) 7436 x 22=
18) 5390 x 86=
19) 3797 x 20=
20) 6563 x 88=
21) 8292 x 16=
22) 6902 x 23=
23) 8505 x 32=
24) 3923 x 77=
25) 4916 x 95=
26) 9020 x 14=
27) 1444 x 78=
28) 4990 x 86=
29) 7094 x 59=
30) 8306 x 27=
31) 3005 x 59=
32) 8073 x 92=
33) 8760 x 43=
34) 6350 x 98=
35) 5499 x 13=
36) 3317 x 12=
37) 8720 x 86=
38) 8466 x 16=
39) 2229 x 30=
40) 7316 x 86=
41) 5887 x 67=
42) 5507 x 14=
43) 2234 x 72=
44) 7559 x 30=
45) 9277 x 91=
46) 4050 x 25=
47) 7694 x 75=
48) 2944 x 24=
49) 3780 x 31=
50) 5492 x 54=




Answers

1) 3464 * 89 = 308296 2) 5002 * 53 = 265106 3) 7898 * 28 = 221144 4) 3038 * 53 = 161014 5) 7175 * 61 = 437675 6) 2557 * 15 = 38355 7) 4357 * 91 = 396487 8) 3673 * 93 = 341589 9) 4004 * 71 = 284284 10) 1298 * 78 = 101244 11) 2770 * 88 = 243760 12) 7337 * 21 = 154077 13) 5229 * 30 = 156870 14) 4188 * 91 = 381108 15) 5924 * 41 = 242884 16) 3893 * 54 = 210222 17) 7436 * 22 = 163592 18) 5390 * 86 = 463540 19) 3797 * 20 = 75940 20) 6563 * 88 = 577544 21) 8292 * 16 = 132672 22) 6902 * 23 = 158746 23) 8505 * 32 = 272160 24) 3923 * 77 = 302071 25) 4916 * 95 = 467020 26) 9020 * 14 = 126280 27) 1444 * 78 = 112632 28) 4990 * 86 = 429140 29) 7094 * 59 = 418546 30) 8306 * 27 = 224262 31) 3005 * 59 = 177295 32) 8073 * 92 = 742716 33) 8760 * 43 = 376680 34) 6350 * 98 = 622300 35) 5499 * 13 = 71487 36) 3317 * 12 = 39804 37) 8720 * 86 = 749920 38) 8466 * 16 = 135456 39) 2229 * 30 = 66870 40) 7316 * 86 = 629176 41) 5887 * 67 = 394429 42) 5507 * 14 = 77098 43) 2234 * 72 = 160848 44) 7559 * 30 = 226770 45) 9277 * 91 = 844207 46) 4050 * 25 = 101250 47) 7694 * 75 = 577050 48) 2944 * 24 = 70656 49) 3780 * 31 = 117180 50) 5492 * 54 = 296568

Next

Percent worksheets 68

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 68

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets