1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 74

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 74

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on November 13, 2020.

Questions

1) 7495 x 95=
2) 6963 x 77=
3) 1703 x 90=
4) 7394 x 78=
5) 8855 x 24=
6) 6577 x 18=
7) 7197 x 53=
8) 7478 x 92=
9) 5945 x 65=
10) 6951 x 9=
11) 2103 x 82=
12) 7052 x 96=
13) 9966 x 34=
14) 3620 x 25=
15) 3949 x 72=
16) 5223 x 9=
17) 7764 x 51=
18) 1455 x 79=
19) 1808 x 50=
20) 2875 x 77=
21) 3588 x 12=
22) 7574 x 43=
23) 3450 x 55=
24) 2730 x 51=
25) 4152 x 48=
26) 3338 x 16=
27) 9566 x 56=
28) 3288 x 82=
29) 4411 x 62=
30) 6708 x 53=
31) 3943 x 54=
32) 1360 x 49=
33) 1589 x 85=
34) 6722 x 75=
35) 9038 x 71=
36) 7898 x 27=
37) 3229 x 44=
38) 6848 x 19=
39) 6937 x 63=
40) 9455 x 96=
41) 1739 x 36=
42) 7800 x 98=
43) 1292 x 12=
44) 2796 x 92=
45) 6111 x 97=
46) 7562 x 93=
47) 3598 x 14=
48) 4850 x 59=
49) 6509 x 47=
50) 5823 x 51=




Answers

1) 7495 * 95 = 712025 2) 6963 * 77 = 536151 3) 1703 * 90 = 153270 4) 7394 * 78 = 576732 5) 8855 * 24 = 212520 6) 6577 * 18 = 118386 7) 7197 * 53 = 381441 8) 7478 * 92 = 687976 9) 5945 * 65 = 386425 10) 6951 * 9 = 62559 11) 2103 * 82 = 172446 12) 7052 * 96 = 676992 13) 9966 * 34 = 338844 14) 3620 * 25 = 90500 15) 3949 * 72 = 284328 16) 5223 * 9 = 47007 17) 7764 * 51 = 395964 18) 1455 * 79 = 114945 19) 1808 * 50 = 90400 20) 2875 * 77 = 221375 21) 3588 * 12 = 43056 22) 7574 * 43 = 325682 23) 3450 * 55 = 189750 24) 2730 * 51 = 139230 25) 4152 * 48 = 199296 26) 3338 * 16 = 53408 27) 9566 * 56 = 535696 28) 3288 * 82 = 269616 29) 4411 * 62 = 273482 30) 6708 * 53 = 355524 31) 3943 * 54 = 212922 32) 1360 * 49 = 66640 33) 1589 * 85 = 135065 34) 6722 * 75 = 504150 35) 9038 * 71 = 641698 36) 7898 * 27 = 213246 37) 3229 * 44 = 142076 38) 6848 * 19 = 130112 39) 6937 * 63 = 437031 40) 9455 * 96 = 907680 41) 1739 * 36 = 62604 42) 7800 * 98 = 764400 43) 1292 * 12 = 15504 44) 2796 * 92 = 257232 45) 6111 * 97 = 592767 46) 7562 * 93 = 703266 47) 3598 * 14 = 50372 48) 4850 * 59 = 286150 49) 6509 * 47 = 305923 50) 5823 * 51 = 296973

Next

Percent worksheets 74

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 74

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 81

Prime numbers Worksheet 81

Percent worksheets 81

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 81

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 81

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 81

Factors worksheet81

Division with reminder Worksheet 81

Ratios worksheets 80

Prime numbers Worksheet 80

Percent worksheets 80

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets