1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 75

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 75

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on November 14, 2020.

Questions

1) 2558 x 48=
2) 7744 x 78=
3) 7183 x 67=
4) 7840 x 68=
5) 6056 x 59=
6) 8934 x 56=
7) 2249 x 11=
8) 1144 x 30=
9) 8941 x 44=
10) 9211 x 75=
11) 4838 x 47=
12) 8566 x 24=
13) 3209 x 58=
14) 4001 x 82=
15) 7932 x 36=
16) 9181 x 43=
17) 2158 x 39=
18) 2912 x 32=
19) 5325 x 40=
20) 5331 x 42=
21) 3107 x 33=
22) 7479 x 30=
23) 3351 x 92=
24) 6792 x 80=
25) 8955 x 29=
26) 9940 x 68=
27) 1165 x 82=
28) 4754 x 46=
29) 9720 x 37=
30) 2603 x 62=
31) 8474 x 66=
32) 3683 x 11=
33) 6842 x 79=
34) 2317 x 12=
35) 4983 x 53=
36) 9202 x 37=
37) 3029 x 23=
38) 5997 x 50=
39) 8925 x 56=
40) 2755 x 56=
41) 5088 x 27=
42) 1651 x 30=
43) 6413 x 48=
44) 3827 x 64=
45) 5896 x 53=
46) 4088 x 94=
47) 9937 x 54=
48) 8993 x 25=
49) 4795 x 12=
50) 5253 x 65=




Answers

1) 2558 * 48 = 122784 2) 7744 * 78 = 604032 3) 7183 * 67 = 481261 4) 7840 * 68 = 533120 5) 6056 * 59 = 357304 6) 8934 * 56 = 500304 7) 2249 * 11 = 24739 8) 1144 * 30 = 34320 9) 8941 * 44 = 393404 10) 9211 * 75 = 690825 11) 4838 * 47 = 227386 12) 8566 * 24 = 205584 13) 3209 * 58 = 186122 14) 4001 * 82 = 328082 15) 7932 * 36 = 285552 16) 9181 * 43 = 394783 17) 2158 * 39 = 84162 18) 2912 * 32 = 93184 19) 5325 * 40 = 213000 20) 5331 * 42 = 223902 21) 3107 * 33 = 102531 22) 7479 * 30 = 224370 23) 3351 * 92 = 308292 24) 6792 * 80 = 543360 25) 8955 * 29 = 259695 26) 9940 * 68 = 675920 27) 1165 * 82 = 95530 28) 4754 * 46 = 218684 29) 9720 * 37 = 359640 30) 2603 * 62 = 161386 31) 8474 * 66 = 559284 32) 3683 * 11 = 40513 33) 6842 * 79 = 540518 34) 2317 * 12 = 27804 35) 4983 * 53 = 264099 36) 9202 * 37 = 340474 37) 3029 * 23 = 69667 38) 5997 * 50 = 299850 39) 8925 * 56 = 499800 40) 2755 * 56 = 154280 41) 5088 * 27 = 137376 42) 1651 * 30 = 49530 43) 6413 * 48 = 307824 44) 3827 * 64 = 244928 45) 5896 * 53 = 312488 46) 4088 * 94 = 384272 47) 9937 * 54 = 536598 48) 8993 * 25 = 224825 49) 4795 * 12 = 57540 50) 5253 * 65 = 341445

Next

Percent worksheets 75

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 75

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 91

Prime numbers Worksheet 91

Percent worksheets 91

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 91

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 91

Factors worksheet91

Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Ratios worksheets 90

Prime numbers Worksheet 90

Percent worksheets 90

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets