1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 76

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 76

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on November 15, 2020.

Questions

1) 4975 x 93=
2) 4733 x 21=
3) 2727 x 57=
4) 5664 x 64=
5) 3790 x 11=
6) 2240 x 89=
7) 1724 x 50=
8) 5768 x 60=
9) 3145 x 27=
10) 8622 x 47=
11) 2736 x 72=
12) 4668 x 57=
13) 3618 x 79=
14) 5990 x 74=
15) 2219 x 40=
16) 3490 x 98=
17) 1783 x 44=
18) 2218 x 71=
19) 5931 x 41=
20) 5463 x 64=
21) 4362 x 76=
22) 3576 x 16=
23) 5930 x 31=
24) 1810 x 71=
25) 7653 x 31=
26) 9808 x 12=
27) 6080 x 32=
28) 2406 x 84=
29) 1560 x 47=
30) 2527 x 43=
31) 9341 x 60=
32) 1013 x 99=
33) 1818 x 92=
34) 3234 x 92=
35) 3944 x 17=
36) 3790 x 61=
37) 9629 x 47=
38) 7680 x 24=
39) 1205 x 50=
40) 2171 x 84=
41) 3690 x 80=
42) 2714 x 71=
43) 8312 x 94=
44) 6980 x 23=
45) 8731 x 91=
46) 5237 x 59=
47) 8853 x 58=
48) 3095 x 39=
49) 5379 x 80=
50) 4486 x 24=




Answers

1) 4975 * 93 = 462675 2) 4733 * 21 = 99393 3) 2727 * 57 = 155439 4) 5664 * 64 = 362496 5) 3790 * 11 = 41690 6) 2240 * 89 = 199360 7) 1724 * 50 = 86200 8) 5768 * 60 = 346080 9) 3145 * 27 = 84915 10) 8622 * 47 = 405234 11) 2736 * 72 = 196992 12) 4668 * 57 = 266076 13) 3618 * 79 = 285822 14) 5990 * 74 = 443260 15) 2219 * 40 = 88760 16) 3490 * 98 = 342020 17) 1783 * 44 = 78452 18) 2218 * 71 = 157478 19) 5931 * 41 = 243171 20) 5463 * 64 = 349632 21) 4362 * 76 = 331512 22) 3576 * 16 = 57216 23) 5930 * 31 = 183830 24) 1810 * 71 = 128510 25) 7653 * 31 = 237243 26) 9808 * 12 = 117696 27) 6080 * 32 = 194560 28) 2406 * 84 = 202104 29) 1560 * 47 = 73320 30) 2527 * 43 = 108661 31) 9341 * 60 = 560460 32) 1013 * 99 = 100287 33) 1818 * 92 = 167256 34) 3234 * 92 = 297528 35) 3944 * 17 = 67048 36) 3790 * 61 = 231190 37) 9629 * 47 = 452563 38) 7680 * 24 = 184320 39) 1205 * 50 = 60250 40) 2171 * 84 = 182364 41) 3690 * 80 = 295200 42) 2714 * 71 = 192694 43) 8312 * 94 = 781328 44) 6980 * 23 = 160540 45) 8731 * 91 = 794521 46) 5237 * 59 = 308983 47) 8853 * 58 = 513474 48) 3095 * 39 = 120705 49) 5379 * 80 = 430320 50) 4486 * 24 = 107664

Next

Percent worksheets 76

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 76

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 89

Prime numbers Worksheet 89

Percent worksheets 89

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 89

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 89

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 89

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 89

Factors worksheet89

Division with reminder Worksheet 89

Ratios worksheets 88

Prime numbers Worksheet 88

Percent worksheets 88

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets