1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 77

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 77

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on November 16, 2020.

Questions

1) 9497 x 44=
2) 3141 x 68=
3) 8319 x 45=
4) 3221 x 51=
5) 3257 x 47=
6) 7722 x 81=
7) 5715 x 59=
8) 7619 x 30=
9) 5292 x 28=
10) 2909 x 30=
11) 1578 x 12=
12) 3186 x 75=
13) 9716 x 86=
14) 5761 x 94=
15) 1971 x 84=
16) 3007 x 37=
17) 9899 x 40=
18) 4740 x 59=
19) 7597 x 47=
20) 1583 x 20=
21) 5778 x 58=
22) 9837 x 69=
23) 1783 x 32=
24) 5138 x 84=
25) 8472 x 24=
26) 9336 x 54=
27) 2398 x 82=
28) 2687 x 60=
29) 3980 x 60=
30) 6240 x 29=
31) 7503 x 79=
32) 7490 x 77=
33) 2345 x 45=
34) 3091 x 12=
35) 6172 x 12=
36) 6379 x 39=
37) 7076 x 57=
38) 3472 x 61=
39) 7726 x 10=
40) 4077 x 58=
41) 5559 x 51=
42) 4270 x 24=
43) 3652 x 53=
44) 3820 x 70=
45) 6024 x 23=
46) 1350 x 98=
47) 5671 x 37=
48) 2840 x 53=
49) 6767 x 32=
50) 4475 x 25=




Answers

1) 9497 * 44 = 417868 2) 3141 * 68 = 213588 3) 8319 * 45 = 374355 4) 3221 * 51 = 164271 5) 3257 * 47 = 153079 6) 7722 * 81 = 625482 7) 5715 * 59 = 337185 8) 7619 * 30 = 228570 9) 5292 * 28 = 148176 10) 2909 * 30 = 87270 11) 1578 * 12 = 18936 12) 3186 * 75 = 238950 13) 9716 * 86 = 835576 14) 5761 * 94 = 541534 15) 1971 * 84 = 165564 16) 3007 * 37 = 111259 17) 9899 * 40 = 395960 18) 4740 * 59 = 279660 19) 7597 * 47 = 357059 20) 1583 * 20 = 31660 21) 5778 * 58 = 335124 22) 9837 * 69 = 678753 23) 1783 * 32 = 57056 24) 5138 * 84 = 431592 25) 8472 * 24 = 203328 26) 9336 * 54 = 504144 27) 2398 * 82 = 196636 28) 2687 * 60 = 161220 29) 3980 * 60 = 238800 30) 6240 * 29 = 180960 31) 7503 * 79 = 592737 32) 7490 * 77 = 576730 33) 2345 * 45 = 105525 34) 3091 * 12 = 37092 35) 6172 * 12 = 74064 36) 6379 * 39 = 248781 37) 7076 * 57 = 403332 38) 3472 * 61 = 211792 39) 7726 * 10 = 77260 40) 4077 * 58 = 236466 41) 5559 * 51 = 283509 42) 4270 * 24 = 102480 43) 3652 * 53 = 193556 44) 3820 * 70 = 267400 45) 6024 * 23 = 138552 46) 1350 * 98 = 132300 47) 5671 * 37 = 209827 48) 2840 * 53 = 150520 49) 6767 * 32 = 216544 50) 4475 * 25 = 111875

Next

Percent worksheets 77

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 77

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 91

Prime numbers Worksheet 91

Percent worksheets 91

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 91

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 91

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 91

Factors worksheet91

Division with reminder Worksheet 91

Ratios worksheets 90

Prime numbers Worksheet 90

Percent worksheets 90

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets