1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 80

Multiply 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 80

Last updated on December 3, 2020. Created on November 19, 2020.

Questions

1) 5461 x 62=
2) 2869 x 19=
3) 7345 x 38=
4) 6324 x 41=
5) 1151 x 39=
6) 4599 x 46=
7) 4558 x 13=
8) 5269 x 28=
9) 5659 x 81=
10) 5971 x 93=
11) 9973 x 88=
12) 2174 x 19=
13) 7852 x 44=
14) 1238 x 20=
15) 3866 x 37=
16) 1751 x 32=
17) 5849 x 45=
18) 4275 x 98=
19) 5085 x 40=
20) 7370 x 87=
21) 2672 x 22=
22) 5738 x 18=
23) 6614 x 44=
24) 1209 x 85=
25) 2042 x 9=
26) 6391 x 91=
27) 6396 x 56=
28) 2020 x 10=
29) 1251 x 65=
30) 2759 x 51=
31) 9084 x 83=
32) 8644 x 98=
33) 8811 x 70=
34) 2152 x 58=
35) 5502 x 76=
36) 9872 x 28=
37) 1750 x 56=
38) 2513 x 59=
39) 8657 x 83=
40) 8796 x 47=
41) 8008 x 13=
42) 8834 x 88=
43) 9765 x 23=
44) 7131 x 53=
45) 7122 x 20=
46) 7744 x 16=
47) 5752 x 40=
48) 2215 x 27=
49) 9436 x 53=
50) 6851 x 89=




Answers

1) 5461 * 62 = 338582 2) 2869 * 19 = 54511 3) 7345 * 38 = 279110 4) 6324 * 41 = 259284 5) 1151 * 39 = 44889 6) 4599 * 46 = 211554 7) 4558 * 13 = 59254 8) 5269 * 28 = 147532 9) 5659 * 81 = 458379 10) 5971 * 93 = 555303 11) 9973 * 88 = 877624 12) 2174 * 19 = 41306 13) 7852 * 44 = 345488 14) 1238 * 20 = 24760 15) 3866 * 37 = 143042 16) 1751 * 32 = 56032 17) 5849 * 45 = 263205 18) 4275 * 98 = 418950 19) 5085 * 40 = 203400 20) 7370 * 87 = 641190 21) 2672 * 22 = 58784 22) 5738 * 18 = 103284 23) 6614 * 44 = 291016 24) 1209 * 85 = 102765 25) 2042 * 9 = 18378 26) 6391 * 91 = 581581 27) 6396 * 56 = 358176 28) 2020 * 10 = 20200 29) 1251 * 65 = 81315 30) 2759 * 51 = 140709 31) 9084 * 83 = 753972 32) 8644 * 98 = 847112 33) 8811 * 70 = 616770 34) 2152 * 58 = 124816 35) 5502 * 76 = 418152 36) 9872 * 28 = 276416 37) 1750 * 56 = 98000 38) 2513 * 59 = 148267 39) 8657 * 83 = 718531 40) 8796 * 47 = 413412 41) 8008 * 13 = 104104 42) 8834 * 88 = 777392 43) 9765 * 23 = 224595 44) 7131 * 53 = 377943 45) 7122 * 20 = 142440 46) 7744 * 16 = 123904 47) 5752 * 40 = 230080 48) 2215 * 27 = 59805 49) 9436 * 53 = 500108 50) 6851 * 89 = 609739

Next

Percent worksheets 80

Previous

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 80

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 94

Prime numbers Worksheet 94

Percent worksheets 94

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 94

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 94

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 94

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 94

Factors worksheet94

Division with reminder Worksheet 94

Ratios worksheets 93

Prime numbers Worksheet 93

Percent worksheets 93

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets