JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 1

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 1

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 1, 2020.

Questions

1) 8983 x 368=
2) 4750 x 264=
3) 5488 x 408=
4) 8147 x 417=
5) 2795 x 477=
6) 4107 x 276=
7) 1558 x 472=
8) 7206 x 940=
9) 1637 x 607=
10) 7070 x 933=
11) 4680 x 365=
12) 7837 x 316=
13) 2527 x 545=
14) 1180 x 438=
15) 9286 x 964=
16) 8581 x 265=
17) 6161 x 715=
18) 5249 x 262=
19) 8841 x 352=
20) 1437 x 759=
21) 3682 x 741=
22) 9566 x 976=
23) 1865 x 969=
24) 4356 x 247=
25) 4402 x 913=
26) 9079 x 171=
27) 8384 x 146=
28) 8344 x 125=
29) 5533 x 228=
30) 3750 x 300=
31) 3938 x 429=
32) 9173 x 838=
33) 4095 x 938=
34) 5557 x 395=
35) 1529 x 388=
36) 4002 x 174=
37) 7495 x 550=
38) 6481 x 864=
39) 4417 x 397=
40) 8308 x 309=
41) 6340 x 627=
42) 3309 x 680=
43) 6838 x 378=
44) 5142 x 509=
45) 2709 x 338=
46) 3689 x 801=
47) 8408 x 541=
48) 5638 x 852=
49) 5604 x 840=
50) 1683 x 156=




Answers

1) 8983 * 368 = 3305744 2) 4750 * 264 = 1254000 3) 5488 * 408 = 2239104 4) 8147 * 417 = 3397299 5) 2795 * 477 = 1333215 6) 4107 * 276 = 1133532 7) 1558 * 472 = 735376 8) 7206 * 940 = 6773640 9) 1637 * 607 = 993659 10) 7070 * 933 = 6596310 11) 4680 * 365 = 1708200 12) 7837 * 316 = 2476492 13) 2527 * 545 = 1377215 14) 1180 * 438 = 516840 15) 9286 * 964 = 8951704 16) 8581 * 265 = 2273965 17) 6161 * 715 = 4405115 18) 5249 * 262 = 1375238 19) 8841 * 352 = 3112032 20) 1437 * 759 = 1090683 21) 3682 * 741 = 2728362 22) 9566 * 976 = 9336416 23) 1865 * 969 = 1807185 24) 4356 * 247 = 1075932 25) 4402 * 913 = 4019026 26) 9079 * 171 = 1552509 27) 8384 * 146 = 1224064 28) 8344 * 125 = 1043000 29) 5533 * 228 = 1261524 30) 3750 * 300 = 1125000 31) 3938 * 429 = 1689402 32) 9173 * 838 = 7686974 33) 4095 * 938 = 3841110 34) 5557 * 395 = 2195015 35) 1529 * 388 = 593252 36) 4002 * 174 = 696348 37) 7495 * 550 = 4122250 38) 6481 * 864 = 5599584 39) 4417 * 397 = 1753549 40) 8308 * 309 = 2567172 41) 6340 * 627 = 3975180 42) 3309 * 680 = 2250120 43) 6838 * 378 = 2584764 44) 5142 * 509 = 2617278 45) 2709 * 338 = 915642 46) 3689 * 801 = 2954889 47) 8408 * 541 = 4548728 48) 5638 * 852 = 4803576 49) 5604 * 840 = 4707360 50) 1683 * 156 = 262548

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 1

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 1

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets