JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 10

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 10

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 10, 2020.

Questions

1) 5454 x 701=
2) 4496 x 206=
3) 6313 x 315=
4) 7903 x 424=
5) 2694 x 224=
6) 9438 x 142=
7) 4380 x 859=
8) 5515 x 574=
9) 4129 x 376=
10) 4792 x 515=
11) 4596 x 952=
12) 1648 x 264=
13) 4621 x 651=
14) 3106 x 998=
15) 9093 x 343=
16) 8796 x 578=
17) 9851 x 228=
18) 5984 x 210=
19) 3878 x 199=
20) 5544 x 641=
21) 2668 x 372=
22) 4022 x 765=
23) 3585 x 693=
24) 2844 x 429=
25) 5676 x 146=
26) 3676 x 831=
27) 8598 x 977=
28) 4439 x 933=
29) 1098 x 352=
30) 1149 x 323=
31) 3372 x 288=
32) 4722 x 287=
33) 4297 x 665=
34) 3764 x 803=
35) 8628 x 774=
36) 5508 x 994=
37) 2675 x 414=
38) 2684 x 150=
39) 7368 x 385=
40) 8174 x 506=
41) 1348 x 321=
42) 4715 x 568=
43) 9722 x 774=
44) 1281 x 713=
45) 8636 x 677=
46) 4061 x 749=
47) 7877 x 966=
48) 8206 x 300=
49) 2253 x 354=
50) 2552 x 850=




Answers

1) 5454 * 701 = 3823254 2) 4496 * 206 = 926176 3) 6313 * 315 = 1988595 4) 7903 * 424 = 3350872 5) 2694 * 224 = 603456 6) 9438 * 142 = 1340196 7) 4380 * 859 = 3762420 8) 5515 * 574 = 3165610 9) 4129 * 376 = 1552504 10) 4792 * 515 = 2467880 11) 4596 * 952 = 4375392 12) 1648 * 264 = 435072 13) 4621 * 651 = 3008271 14) 3106 * 998 = 3099788 15) 9093 * 343 = 3118899 16) 8796 * 578 = 5084088 17) 9851 * 228 = 2246028 18) 5984 * 210 = 1256640 19) 3878 * 199 = 771722 20) 5544 * 641 = 3553704 21) 2668 * 372 = 992496 22) 4022 * 765 = 3076830 23) 3585 * 693 = 2484405 24) 2844 * 429 = 1220076 25) 5676 * 146 = 828696 26) 3676 * 831 = 3054756 27) 8598 * 977 = 8400246 28) 4439 * 933 = 4141587 29) 1098 * 352 = 386496 30) 1149 * 323 = 371127 31) 3372 * 288 = 971136 32) 4722 * 287 = 1355214 33) 4297 * 665 = 2857505 34) 3764 * 803 = 3022492 35) 8628 * 774 = 6678072 36) 5508 * 994 = 5474952 37) 2675 * 414 = 1107450 38) 2684 * 150 = 402600 39) 7368 * 385 = 2836680 40) 8174 * 506 = 4136044 41) 1348 * 321 = 432708 42) 4715 * 568 = 2678120 43) 9722 * 774 = 7524828 44) 1281 * 713 = 913353 45) 8636 * 677 = 5846572 46) 4061 * 749 = 3041689 47) 7877 * 966 = 7609182 48) 8206 * 300 = 2461800 49) 2253 * 354 = 797562 50) 2552 * 850 = 2169200

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 10

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 10

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets