JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 100

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 100

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 9, 2020.

Questions

1) 5233 x 678=
2) 9936 x 745=
3) 7347 x 342=
4) 5000 x 465=
5) 5973 x 522=
6) 8770 x 317=
7) 6986 x 717=
8) 5121 x 380=
9) 4000 x 553=
10) 7623 x 301=
11) 1051 x 368=
12) 8317 x 724=
13) 5569 x 375=
14) 9309 x 343=
15) 8190 x 469=
16) 9566 x 948=
17) 6054 x 740=
18) 1980 x 141=
19) 4163 x 253=
20) 6562 x 818=
21) 9963 x 381=
22) 3512 x 712=
23) 4829 x 932=
24) 8992 x 504=
25) 5165 x 654=
26) 9357 x 265=
27) 2247 x 302=
28) 4312 x 241=
29) 6822 x 696=
30) 7143 x 862=
31) 6409 x 938=
32) 9425 x 322=
33) 9644 x 980=
34) 4391 x 107=
35) 4840 x 887=
36) 7611 x 891=
37) 6257 x 966=
38) 1267 x 213=
39) 7101 x 901=
40) 3293 x 104=
41) 1581 x 880=
42) 8297 x 136=
43) 5511 x 307=
44) 2998 x 955=
45) 5023 x 435=
46) 2461 x 766=
47) 9561 x 778=
48) 1627 x 699=
49) 9545 x 99=
50) 8658 x 181=




Answers

1) 5233 * 678 = 3547974 2) 9936 * 745 = 7402320 3) 7347 * 342 = 2512674 4) 5000 * 465 = 2325000 5) 5973 * 522 = 3117906 6) 8770 * 317 = 2780090 7) 6986 * 717 = 5008962 8) 5121 * 380 = 1945980 9) 4000 * 553 = 2212000 10) 7623 * 301 = 2294523 11) 1051 * 368 = 386768 12) 8317 * 724 = 6021508 13) 5569 * 375 = 2088375 14) 9309 * 343 = 3192987 15) 8190 * 469 = 3841110 16) 9566 * 948 = 9068568 17) 6054 * 740 = 4479960 18) 1980 * 141 = 279180 19) 4163 * 253 = 1053239 20) 6562 * 818 = 5367716 21) 9963 * 381 = 3795903 22) 3512 * 712 = 2500544 23) 4829 * 932 = 4500628 24) 8992 * 504 = 4531968 25) 5165 * 654 = 3377910 26) 9357 * 265 = 2479605 27) 2247 * 302 = 678594 28) 4312 * 241 = 1039192 29) 6822 * 696 = 4748112 30) 7143 * 862 = 6157266 31) 6409 * 938 = 6011642 32) 9425 * 322 = 3034850 33) 9644 * 980 = 9451120 34) 4391 * 107 = 469837 35) 4840 * 887 = 4293080 36) 7611 * 891 = 6781401 37) 6257 * 966 = 6044262 38) 1267 * 213 = 269871 39) 7101 * 901 = 6398001 40) 3293 * 104 = 342472 41) 1581 * 880 = 1391280 42) 8297 * 136 = 1128392 43) 5511 * 307 = 1691877 44) 2998 * 955 = 2863090 45) 5023 * 435 = 2185005 46) 2461 * 766 = 1885126 47) 9561 * 778 = 7438458 48) 1627 * 699 = 1137273 49) 9545 * 99 = 944955 50) 8658 * 181 = 1567098

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 100

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 100

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets