JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 101

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 101

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 10, 2020.

Questions

1) 8399 x 416=
2) 2622 x 470=
3) 6367 x 567=
4) 5019 x 219=
5) 4437 x 491=
6) 9465 x 429=
7) 7387 x 304=
8) 8579 x 415=
9) 1485 x 152=
10) 4706 x 471=
11) 3680 x 716=
12) 8757 x 123=
13) 1365 x 499=
14) 6161 x 116=
15) 6690 x 621=
16) 9516 x 282=
17) 5102 x 226=
18) 8583 x 535=
19) 3109 x 431=
20) 4072 x 820=
21) 3584 x 733=
22) 3873 x 191=
23) 7659 x 449=
24) 8972 x 256=
25) 3949 x 816=
26) 4314 x 502=
27) 1338 x 296=
28) 9148 x 263=
29) 3010 x 620=
30) 3507 x 454=
31) 9154 x 590=
32) 1903 x 536=
33) 7981 x 632=
34) 6606 x 823=
35) 3096 x 290=
36) 3000 x 750=
37) 4174 x 474=
38) 8151 x 235=
39) 2625 x 589=
40) 9789 x 837=
41) 2170 x 667=
42) 8935 x 260=
43) 1727 x 757=
44) 7883 x 512=
45) 5603 x 890=
46) 7304 x 692=
47) 3035 x 307=
48) 2980 x 202=
49) 2186 x 301=
50) 1368 x 592=




Answers

1) 8399 * 416 = 3493984 2) 2622 * 470 = 1232340 3) 6367 * 567 = 3610089 4) 5019 * 219 = 1099161 5) 4437 * 491 = 2178567 6) 9465 * 429 = 4060485 7) 7387 * 304 = 2245648 8) 8579 * 415 = 3560285 9) 1485 * 152 = 225720 10) 4706 * 471 = 2216526 11) 3680 * 716 = 2634880 12) 8757 * 123 = 1077111 13) 1365 * 499 = 681135 14) 6161 * 116 = 714676 15) 6690 * 621 = 4154490 16) 9516 * 282 = 2683512 17) 5102 * 226 = 1153052 18) 8583 * 535 = 4591905 19) 3109 * 431 = 1339979 20) 4072 * 820 = 3339040 21) 3584 * 733 = 2627072 22) 3873 * 191 = 739743 23) 7659 * 449 = 3438891 24) 8972 * 256 = 2296832 25) 3949 * 816 = 3222384 26) 4314 * 502 = 2165628 27) 1338 * 296 = 396048 28) 9148 * 263 = 2405924 29) 3010 * 620 = 1866200 30) 3507 * 454 = 1592178 31) 9154 * 590 = 5400860 32) 1903 * 536 = 1020008 33) 7981 * 632 = 5043992 34) 6606 * 823 = 5436738 35) 3096 * 290 = 897840 36) 3000 * 750 = 2250000 37) 4174 * 474 = 1978476 38) 8151 * 235 = 1915485 39) 2625 * 589 = 1546125 40) 9789 * 837 = 8193393 41) 2170 * 667 = 1447390 42) 8935 * 260 = 2323100 43) 1727 * 757 = 1307339 44) 7883 * 512 = 4036096 45) 5603 * 890 = 4986670 46) 7304 * 692 = 5054368 47) 3035 * 307 = 931745 48) 2980 * 202 = 601960 49) 2186 * 301 = 657986 50) 1368 * 592 = 809856

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 101

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 101

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets