JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 102

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 102

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 11, 2020.

Questions

1) 6484 x 565=
2) 2729 x 486=
3) 6144 x 373=
4) 6426 x 704=
5) 1644 x 774=
6) 1571 x 707=
7) 4907 x 434=
8) 3292 x 734=
9) 9031 x 233=
10) 9478 x 581=
11) 4161 x 952=
12) 3442 x 877=
13) 3445 x 210=
14) 3694 x 649=
15) 3678 x 228=
16) 3916 x 213=
17) 8249 x 601=
18) 8639 x 297=
19) 6693 x 343=
20) 1071 x 742=
21) 6249 x 568=
22) 3456 x 196=
23) 1222 x 899=
24) 1486 x 514=
25) 2468 x 847=
26) 1085 x 203=
27) 1880 x 667=
28) 8878 x 716=
29) 7873 x 454=
30) 2084 x 899=
31) 4275 x 381=
32) 1067 x 415=
33) 1685 x 379=
34) 5225 x 520=
35) 9942 x 609=
36) 6910 x 304=
37) 5444 x 698=
38) 5161 x 127=
39) 6888 x 108=
40) 9788 x 478=
41) 9375 x 704=
42) 2092 x 870=
43) 9852 x 822=
44) 1801 x 837=
45) 8085 x 747=
46) 7097 x 218=
47) 9134 x 373=
48) 4976 x 508=
49) 6344 x 392=
50) 1562 x 499=




Answers

1) 6484 * 565 = 3663460 2) 2729 * 486 = 1326294 3) 6144 * 373 = 2291712 4) 6426 * 704 = 4523904 5) 1644 * 774 = 1272456 6) 1571 * 707 = 1110697 7) 4907 * 434 = 2129638 8) 3292 * 734 = 2416328 9) 9031 * 233 = 2104223 10) 9478 * 581 = 5506718 11) 4161 * 952 = 3961272 12) 3442 * 877 = 3018634 13) 3445 * 210 = 723450 14) 3694 * 649 = 2397406 15) 3678 * 228 = 838584 16) 3916 * 213 = 834108 17) 8249 * 601 = 4957649 18) 8639 * 297 = 2565783 19) 6693 * 343 = 2295699 20) 1071 * 742 = 794682 21) 6249 * 568 = 3549432 22) 3456 * 196 = 677376 23) 1222 * 899 = 1098578 24) 1486 * 514 = 763804 25) 2468 * 847 = 2090396 26) 1085 * 203 = 220255 27) 1880 * 667 = 1253960 28) 8878 * 716 = 6356648 29) 7873 * 454 = 3574342 30) 2084 * 899 = 1873516 31) 4275 * 381 = 1628775 32) 1067 * 415 = 442805 33) 1685 * 379 = 638615 34) 5225 * 520 = 2717000 35) 9942 * 609 = 6054678 36) 6910 * 304 = 2100640 37) 5444 * 698 = 3799912 38) 5161 * 127 = 655447 39) 6888 * 108 = 743904 40) 9788 * 478 = 4678664 41) 9375 * 704 = 6600000 42) 2092 * 870 = 1820040 43) 9852 * 822 = 8098344 44) 1801 * 837 = 1507437 45) 8085 * 747 = 6039495 46) 7097 * 218 = 1547146 47) 9134 * 373 = 3406982 48) 4976 * 508 = 2527808 49) 6344 * 392 = 2486848 50) 1562 * 499 = 779438

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 102

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 102

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets