JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 103

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 103

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 12, 2020.

Questions

1) 8805 x 593=
2) 9734 x 319=
3) 9893 x 499=
4) 4810 x 143=
5) 2065 x 810=
6) 7840 x 391=
7) 5159 x 171=
8) 6342 x 840=
9) 2625 x 597=
10) 3613 x 923=
11) 5184 x 293=
12) 5502 x 946=
13) 4576 x 248=
14) 8344 x 959=
15) 7976 x 278=
16) 9864 x 888=
17) 2109 x 536=
18) 6334 x 996=
19) 3084 x 627=
20) 1358 x 285=
21) 9862 x 781=
22) 4049 x 789=
23) 1457 x 991=
24) 6822 x 673=
25) 5920 x 950=
26) 1736 x 997=
27) 8618 x 930=
28) 8010 x 223=
29) 3828 x 495=
30) 2941 x 414=
31) 6003 x 167=
32) 5986 x 406=
33) 2961 x 440=
34) 6106 x 805=
35) 3176 x 946=
36) 2109 x 945=
37) 3061 x 503=
38) 8951 x 143=
39) 5478 x 279=
40) 1350 x 664=
41) 9896 x 801=
42) 5007 x 962=
43) 4452 x 804=
44) 9350 x 907=
45) 9300 x 164=
46) 7311 x 648=
47) 7195 x 123=
48) 5342 x 447=
49) 3615 x 460=
50) 7020 x 970=




Answers

1) 8805 * 593 = 5221365 2) 9734 * 319 = 3105146 3) 9893 * 499 = 4936607 4) 4810 * 143 = 687830 5) 2065 * 810 = 1672650 6) 7840 * 391 = 3065440 7) 5159 * 171 = 882189 8) 6342 * 840 = 5327280 9) 2625 * 597 = 1567125 10) 3613 * 923 = 3334799 11) 5184 * 293 = 1518912 12) 5502 * 946 = 5204892 13) 4576 * 248 = 1134848 14) 8344 * 959 = 8001896 15) 7976 * 278 = 2217328 16) 9864 * 888 = 8759232 17) 2109 * 536 = 1130424 18) 6334 * 996 = 6308664 19) 3084 * 627 = 1933668 20) 1358 * 285 = 387030 21) 9862 * 781 = 7702222 22) 4049 * 789 = 3194661 23) 1457 * 991 = 1443887 24) 6822 * 673 = 4591206 25) 5920 * 950 = 5624000 26) 1736 * 997 = 1730792 27) 8618 * 930 = 8014740 28) 8010 * 223 = 1786230 29) 3828 * 495 = 1894860 30) 2941 * 414 = 1217574 31) 6003 * 167 = 1002501 32) 5986 * 406 = 2430316 33) 2961 * 440 = 1302840 34) 6106 * 805 = 4915330 35) 3176 * 946 = 3004496 36) 2109 * 945 = 1993005 37) 3061 * 503 = 1539683 38) 8951 * 143 = 1279993 39) 5478 * 279 = 1528362 40) 1350 * 664 = 896400 41) 9896 * 801 = 7926696 42) 5007 * 962 = 4816734 43) 4452 * 804 = 3579408 44) 9350 * 907 = 8480450 45) 9300 * 164 = 1525200 46) 7311 * 648 = 4737528 47) 7195 * 123 = 884985 48) 5342 * 447 = 2387874 49) 3615 * 460 = 1662900 50) 7020 * 970 = 6809400

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 103

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 103

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets