JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 104

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 104

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 13, 2020.

Questions

1) 3274 x 637=
2) 8698 x 552=
3) 9310 x 462=
4) 8307 x 486=
5) 3115 x 793=
6) 4313 x 719=
7) 4263 x 634=
8) 3412 x 706=
9) 8861 x 193=
10) 9627 x 337=
11) 2534 x 711=
12) 5283 x 306=
13) 5435 x 951=
14) 1665 x 599=
15) 3808 x 476=
16) 1913 x 378=
17) 8687 x 778=
18) 4522 x 614=
19) 4150 x 587=
20) 5314 x 830=
21) 1320 x 502=
22) 3018 x 289=
23) 5011 x 223=
24) 3282 x 954=
25) 4047 x 547=
26) 3040 x 850=
27) 4751 x 109=
28) 7983 x 333=
29) 2147 x 477=
30) 4788 x 695=
31) 6447 x 293=
32) 6366 x 351=
33) 2253 x 764=
34) 5042 x 301=
35) 7370 x 714=
36) 9044 x 342=
37) 3884 x 667=
38) 1434 x 298=
39) 3229 x 761=
40) 7569 x 801=
41) 3388 x 332=
42) 1868 x 460=
43) 8196 x 755=
44) 9267 x 651=
45) 2215 x 153=
46) 1282 x 676=
47) 5528 x 721=
48) 3492 x 353=
49) 6536 x 875=
50) 6882 x 256=




Answers

1) 3274 * 637 = 2085538 2) 8698 * 552 = 4801296 3) 9310 * 462 = 4301220 4) 8307 * 486 = 4037202 5) 3115 * 793 = 2470195 6) 4313 * 719 = 3101047 7) 4263 * 634 = 2702742 8) 3412 * 706 = 2408872 9) 8861 * 193 = 1710173 10) 9627 * 337 = 3244299 11) 2534 * 711 = 1801674 12) 5283 * 306 = 1616598 13) 5435 * 951 = 5168685 14) 1665 * 599 = 997335 15) 3808 * 476 = 1812608 16) 1913 * 378 = 723114 17) 8687 * 778 = 6758486 18) 4522 * 614 = 2776508 19) 4150 * 587 = 2436050 20) 5314 * 830 = 4410620 21) 1320 * 502 = 662640 22) 3018 * 289 = 872202 23) 5011 * 223 = 1117453 24) 3282 * 954 = 3131028 25) 4047 * 547 = 2213709 26) 3040 * 850 = 2584000 27) 4751 * 109 = 517859 28) 7983 * 333 = 2658339 29) 2147 * 477 = 1024119 30) 4788 * 695 = 3327660 31) 6447 * 293 = 1888971 32) 6366 * 351 = 2234466 33) 2253 * 764 = 1721292 34) 5042 * 301 = 1517642 35) 7370 * 714 = 5262180 36) 9044 * 342 = 3093048 37) 3884 * 667 = 2590628 38) 1434 * 298 = 427332 39) 3229 * 761 = 2457269 40) 7569 * 801 = 6062769 41) 3388 * 332 = 1124816 42) 1868 * 460 = 859280 43) 8196 * 755 = 6187980 44) 9267 * 651 = 6032817 45) 2215 * 153 = 338895 46) 1282 * 676 = 866632 47) 5528 * 721 = 3985688 48) 3492 * 353 = 1232676 49) 6536 * 875 = 5719000 50) 6882 * 256 = 1761792

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 104

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 104

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets