JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 105

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 105

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 14, 2020.

Questions

1) 1106 x 395=
2) 7311 x 731=
3) 9061 x 458=
4) 3997 x 762=
5) 5661 x 192=
6) 5405 x 591=
7) 5518 x 941=
8) 1443 x 900=
9) 4815 x 364=
10) 8188 x 428=
11) 2566 x 505=
12) 8012 x 264=
13) 2732 x 590=
14) 8670 x 469=
15) 8192 x 740=
16) 1979 x 257=
17) 8859 x 358=
18) 3734 x 806=
19) 7097 x 644=
20) 5634 x 837=
21) 8775 x 447=
22) 1454 x 908=
23) 5119 x 191=
24) 6866 x 440=
25) 7220 x 935=
26) 6427 x 820=
27) 2662 x 123=
28) 6305 x 641=
29) 4738 x 786=
30) 3911 x 400=
31) 7286 x 221=
32) 9767 x 649=
33) 5430 x 772=
34) 5812 x 147=
35) 2328 x 310=
36) 3834 x 360=
37) 9381 x 210=
38) 6193 x 600=
39) 3332 x 203=
40) 1942 x 918=
41) 7168 x 635=
42) 3279 x 798=
43) 8248 x 638=
44) 4875 x 116=
45) 3059 x 798=
46) 8566 x 208=
47) 1269 x 418=
48) 9466 x 326=
49) 4756 x 347=
50) 2848 x 162=




Answers

1) 1106 * 395 = 436870 2) 7311 * 731 = 5344341 3) 9061 * 458 = 4149938 4) 3997 * 762 = 3045714 5) 5661 * 192 = 1086912 6) 5405 * 591 = 3194355 7) 5518 * 941 = 5192438 8) 1443 * 900 = 1298700 9) 4815 * 364 = 1752660 10) 8188 * 428 = 3504464 11) 2566 * 505 = 1295830 12) 8012 * 264 = 2115168 13) 2732 * 590 = 1611880 14) 8670 * 469 = 4066230 15) 8192 * 740 = 6062080 16) 1979 * 257 = 508603 17) 8859 * 358 = 3171522 18) 3734 * 806 = 3009604 19) 7097 * 644 = 4570468 20) 5634 * 837 = 4715658 21) 8775 * 447 = 3922425 22) 1454 * 908 = 1320232 23) 5119 * 191 = 977729 24) 6866 * 440 = 3021040 25) 7220 * 935 = 6750700 26) 6427 * 820 = 5270140 27) 2662 * 123 = 327426 28) 6305 * 641 = 4041505 29) 4738 * 786 = 3724068 30) 3911 * 400 = 1564400 31) 7286 * 221 = 1610206 32) 9767 * 649 = 6338783 33) 5430 * 772 = 4191960 34) 5812 * 147 = 854364 35) 2328 * 310 = 721680 36) 3834 * 360 = 1380240 37) 9381 * 210 = 1970010 38) 6193 * 600 = 3715800 39) 3332 * 203 = 676396 40) 1942 * 918 = 1782756 41) 7168 * 635 = 4551680 42) 3279 * 798 = 2616642 43) 8248 * 638 = 5262224 44) 4875 * 116 = 565500 45) 3059 * 798 = 2441082 46) 8566 * 208 = 1781728 47) 1269 * 418 = 530442 48) 9466 * 326 = 3085916 49) 4756 * 347 = 1650332 50) 2848 * 162 = 461376

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 105

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 105

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets