JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 106

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 106

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 15, 2020.

Questions

1) 7284 x 269=
2) 5690 x 538=
3) 4435 x 834=
4) 3190 x 522=
5) 6296 x 373=
6) 4673 x 427=
7) 7063 x 432=
8) 4585 x 740=
9) 5627 x 284=
10) 3413 x 936=
11) 7648 x 730=
12) 9735 x 362=
13) 4007 x 785=
14) 3506 x 914=
15) 1588 x 202=
16) 9447 x 561=
17) 9616 x 862=
18) 8316 x 894=
19) 9325 x 282=
20) 4589 x 159=
21) 5716 x 815=
22) 2334 x 687=
23) 7886 x 830=
24) 1753 x 992=
25) 6307 x 692=
26) 3427 x 847=
27) 7133 x 264=
28) 2442 x 626=
29) 2264 x 683=
30) 1585 x 756=
31) 6980 x 832=
32) 1491 x 338=
33) 3883 x 315=
34) 5217 x 549=
35) 1261 x 830=
36) 2375 x 902=
37) 4793 x 857=
38) 7715 x 453=
39) 7306 x 369=
40) 2465 x 192=
41) 4197 x 764=
42) 6878 x 627=
43) 9972 x 992=
44) 9415 x 335=
45) 2253 x 300=
46) 9667 x 553=
47) 3194 x 832=
48) 5886 x 913=
49) 7900 x 432=
50) 4913 x 708=




Answers

1) 7284 * 269 = 1959396 2) 5690 * 538 = 3061220 3) 4435 * 834 = 3698790 4) 3190 * 522 = 1665180 5) 6296 * 373 = 2348408 6) 4673 * 427 = 1995371 7) 7063 * 432 = 3051216 8) 4585 * 740 = 3392900 9) 5627 * 284 = 1598068 10) 3413 * 936 = 3194568 11) 7648 * 730 = 5583040 12) 9735 * 362 = 3524070 13) 4007 * 785 = 3145495 14) 3506 * 914 = 3204484 15) 1588 * 202 = 320776 16) 9447 * 561 = 5299767 17) 9616 * 862 = 8288992 18) 8316 * 894 = 7434504 19) 9325 * 282 = 2629650 20) 4589 * 159 = 729651 21) 5716 * 815 = 4658540 22) 2334 * 687 = 1603458 23) 7886 * 830 = 6545380 24) 1753 * 992 = 1738976 25) 6307 * 692 = 4364444 26) 3427 * 847 = 2902669 27) 7133 * 264 = 1883112 28) 2442 * 626 = 1528692 29) 2264 * 683 = 1546312 30) 1585 * 756 = 1198260 31) 6980 * 832 = 5807360 32) 1491 * 338 = 503958 33) 3883 * 315 = 1223145 34) 5217 * 549 = 2864133 35) 1261 * 830 = 1046630 36) 2375 * 902 = 2142250 37) 4793 * 857 = 4107601 38) 7715 * 453 = 3494895 39) 7306 * 369 = 2695914 40) 2465 * 192 = 473280 41) 4197 * 764 = 3206508 42) 6878 * 627 = 4312506 43) 9972 * 992 = 9892224 44) 9415 * 335 = 3154025 45) 2253 * 300 = 675900 46) 9667 * 553 = 5345851 47) 3194 * 832 = 2657408 48) 5886 * 913 = 5373918 49) 7900 * 432 = 3412800 50) 4913 * 708 = 3478404

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 106

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 106

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets