JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 107

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 107

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 16, 2020.

Questions

1) 6132 x 391=
2) 8912 x 933=
3) 8137 x 738=
4) 3481 x 608=
5) 3425 x 587=
6) 7062 x 896=
7) 2563 x 619=
8) 5223 x 903=
9) 8686 x 130=
10) 6412 x 468=
11) 5720 x 527=
12) 4086 x 490=
13) 4105 x 192=
14) 5707 x 833=
15) 4518 x 620=
16) 7189 x 402=
17) 3287 x 333=
18) 8278 x 303=
19) 5652 x 229=
20) 1627 x 108=
21) 2256 x 318=
22) 6281 x 333=
23) 4435 x 334=
24) 9531 x 182=
25) 2071 x 359=
26) 6138 x 920=
27) 1620 x 499=
28) 9630 x 834=
29) 3579 x 306=
30) 7117 x 500=
31) 1984 x 567=
32) 3914 x 618=
33) 2194 x 186=
34) 1248 x 977=
35) 2642 x 783=
36) 8120 x 519=
37) 6889 x 927=
38) 8775 x 309=
39) 3717 x 877=
40) 8491 x 691=
41) 3586 x 304=
42) 4035 x 563=
43) 4002 x 491=
44) 7955 x 951=
45) 8788 x 709=
46) 2321 x 866=
47) 7523 x 133=
48) 5235 x 345=
49) 2977 x 338=
50) 9497 x 905=




Answers

1) 6132 * 391 = 2397612 2) 8912 * 933 = 8314896 3) 8137 * 738 = 6005106 4) 3481 * 608 = 2116448 5) 3425 * 587 = 2010475 6) 7062 * 896 = 6327552 7) 2563 * 619 = 1586497 8) 5223 * 903 = 4716369 9) 8686 * 130 = 1129180 10) 6412 * 468 = 3000816 11) 5720 * 527 = 3014440 12) 4086 * 490 = 2002140 13) 4105 * 192 = 788160 14) 5707 * 833 = 4753931 15) 4518 * 620 = 2801160 16) 7189 * 402 = 2889978 17) 3287 * 333 = 1094571 18) 8278 * 303 = 2508234 19) 5652 * 229 = 1294308 20) 1627 * 108 = 175716 21) 2256 * 318 = 717408 22) 6281 * 333 = 2091573 23) 4435 * 334 = 1481290 24) 9531 * 182 = 1734642 25) 2071 * 359 = 743489 26) 6138 * 920 = 5646960 27) 1620 * 499 = 808380 28) 9630 * 834 = 8031420 29) 3579 * 306 = 1095174 30) 7117 * 500 = 3558500 31) 1984 * 567 = 1124928 32) 3914 * 618 = 2418852 33) 2194 * 186 = 408084 34) 1248 * 977 = 1219296 35) 2642 * 783 = 2068686 36) 8120 * 519 = 4214280 37) 6889 * 927 = 6386103 38) 8775 * 309 = 2711475 39) 3717 * 877 = 3259809 40) 8491 * 691 = 5867281 41) 3586 * 304 = 1090144 42) 4035 * 563 = 2271705 43) 4002 * 491 = 1964982 44) 7955 * 951 = 7565205 45) 8788 * 709 = 6230692 46) 2321 * 866 = 2009986 47) 7523 * 133 = 1000559 48) 5235 * 345 = 1806075 49) 2977 * 338 = 1006226 50) 9497 * 905 = 8594785

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 107

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 107

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets