JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 108

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 108

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 17, 2020.

Questions

1) 1488 x 341=
2) 4499 x 345=
3) 5354 x 565=
4) 7424 x 597=
5) 8334 x 973=
6) 4855 x 533=
7) 2415 x 319=
8) 3950 x 824=
9) 1753 x 292=
10) 8860 x 785=
11) 4346 x 576=
12) 9564 x 141=
13) 3349 x 750=
14) 3794 x 212=
15) 4855 x 854=
16) 9812 x 264=
17) 9790 x 808=
18) 7003 x 715=
19) 3329 x 845=
20) 4551 x 704=
21) 5224 x 486=
22) 6427 x 213=
23) 2598 x 659=
24) 9649 x 838=
25) 4641 x 473=
26) 4985 x 564=
27) 9483 x 735=
28) 6178 x 909=
29) 2360 x 170=
30) 1911 x 554=
31) 7020 x 472=
32) 1568 x 749=
33) 7034 x 671=
34) 2179 x 605=
35) 8565 x 523=
36) 9982 x 678=
37) 6506 x 646=
38) 2290 x 715=
39) 4890 x 433=
40) 7199 x 667=
41) 3682 x 610=
42) 7598 x 376=
43) 9119 x 693=
44) 2231 x 944=
45) 8655 x 487=
46) 5621 x 278=
47) 7076 x 983=
48) 4389 x 281=
49) 9381 x 996=
50) 5866 x 965=




Answers

1) 1488 * 341 = 507408 2) 4499 * 345 = 1552155 3) 5354 * 565 = 3025010 4) 7424 * 597 = 4432128 5) 8334 * 973 = 8108982 6) 4855 * 533 = 2587715 7) 2415 * 319 = 770385 8) 3950 * 824 = 3254800 9) 1753 * 292 = 511876 10) 8860 * 785 = 6955100 11) 4346 * 576 = 2503296 12) 9564 * 141 = 1348524 13) 3349 * 750 = 2511750 14) 3794 * 212 = 804328 15) 4855 * 854 = 4146170 16) 9812 * 264 = 2590368 17) 9790 * 808 = 7910320 18) 7003 * 715 = 5007145 19) 3329 * 845 = 2813005 20) 4551 * 704 = 3203904 21) 5224 * 486 = 2538864 22) 6427 * 213 = 1368951 23) 2598 * 659 = 1712082 24) 9649 * 838 = 8085862 25) 4641 * 473 = 2195193 26) 4985 * 564 = 2811540 27) 9483 * 735 = 6970005 28) 6178 * 909 = 5615802 29) 2360 * 170 = 401200 30) 1911 * 554 = 1058694 31) 7020 * 472 = 3313440 32) 1568 * 749 = 1174432 33) 7034 * 671 = 4719814 34) 2179 * 605 = 1318295 35) 8565 * 523 = 4479495 36) 9982 * 678 = 6767796 37) 6506 * 646 = 4202876 38) 2290 * 715 = 1637350 39) 4890 * 433 = 2117370 40) 7199 * 667 = 4801733 41) 3682 * 610 = 2246020 42) 7598 * 376 = 2856848 43) 9119 * 693 = 6319467 44) 2231 * 944 = 2106064 45) 8655 * 487 = 4214985 46) 5621 * 278 = 1562638 47) 7076 * 983 = 6955708 48) 4389 * 281 = 1233309 49) 9381 * 996 = 9343476 50) 5866 * 965 = 5660690

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 108

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 108

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets