JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 109

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 109

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 18, 2020.

Questions

1) 2667 x 337=
2) 3390 x 594=
3) 2121 x 985=
4) 8688 x 122=
5) 9338 x 450=
6) 9196 x 428=
7) 4027 x 699=
8) 1964 x 970=
9) 4991 x 348=
10) 9199 x 581=
11) 5056 x 143=
12) 6880 x 982=
13) 5369 x 747=
14) 8428 x 928=
15) 3667 x 187=
16) 5432 x 755=
17) 3891 x 799=
18) 9549 x 345=
19) 4093 x 665=
20) 9071 x 763=
21) 2706 x 426=
22) 8010 x 744=
23) 5957 x 512=
24) 7726 x 829=
25) 5362 x 784=
26) 2742 x 777=
27) 8486 x 263=
28) 3840 x 602=
29) 3996 x 396=
30) 8746 x 478=
31) 3070 x 233=
32) 3313 x 954=
33) 5713 x 430=
34) 9003 x 880=
35) 8137 x 450=
36) 8536 x 730=
37) 4143 x 536=
38) 4740 x 397=
39) 1258 x 273=
40) 7487 x 985=
41) 3602 x 498=
42) 2432 x 360=
43) 1183 x 438=
44) 6663 x 416=
45) 8055 x 521=
46) 3909 x 537=
47) 6643 x 305=
48) 6455 x 940=
49) 5397 x 873=
50) 9694 x 821=




Answers

1) 2667 * 337 = 898779 2) 3390 * 594 = 2013660 3) 2121 * 985 = 2089185 4) 8688 * 122 = 1059936 5) 9338 * 450 = 4202100 6) 9196 * 428 = 3935888 7) 4027 * 699 = 2814873 8) 1964 * 970 = 1905080 9) 4991 * 348 = 1736868 10) 9199 * 581 = 5344619 11) 5056 * 143 = 723008 12) 6880 * 982 = 6756160 13) 5369 * 747 = 4010643 14) 8428 * 928 = 7821184 15) 3667 * 187 = 685729 16) 5432 * 755 = 4101160 17) 3891 * 799 = 3108909 18) 9549 * 345 = 3294405 19) 4093 * 665 = 2721845 20) 9071 * 763 = 6921173 21) 2706 * 426 = 1152756 22) 8010 * 744 = 5959440 23) 5957 * 512 = 3049984 24) 7726 * 829 = 6404854 25) 5362 * 784 = 4203808 26) 2742 * 777 = 2130534 27) 8486 * 263 = 2231818 28) 3840 * 602 = 2311680 29) 3996 * 396 = 1582416 30) 8746 * 478 = 4180588 31) 3070 * 233 = 715310 32) 3313 * 954 = 3160602 33) 5713 * 430 = 2456590 34) 9003 * 880 = 7922640 35) 8137 * 450 = 3661650 36) 8536 * 730 = 6231280 37) 4143 * 536 = 2220648 38) 4740 * 397 = 1881780 39) 1258 * 273 = 343434 40) 7487 * 985 = 7374695 41) 3602 * 498 = 1793796 42) 2432 * 360 = 875520 43) 1183 * 438 = 518154 44) 6663 * 416 = 2771808 45) 8055 * 521 = 4196655 46) 3909 * 537 = 2099133 47) 6643 * 305 = 2026115 48) 6455 * 940 = 6067700 49) 5397 * 873 = 4711581 50) 9694 * 821 = 7958774

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 109

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 109

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets