JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 11

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 11

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on September 11, 2020.

Questions

1) 4260 x 150=
2) 6035 x 161=
3) 8103 x 344=
4) 8644 x 842=
5) 9799 x 402=
6) 3432 x 341=
7) 6288 x 549=
8) 7870 x 684=
9) 2172 x 882=
10) 9724 x 332=
11) 4382 x 577=
12) 9799 x 204=
13) 7767 x 996=
14) 7914 x 698=
15) 8207 x 391=
16) 1158 x 708=
17) 7695 x 173=
18) 2254 x 634=
19) 8174 x 639=
20) 3803 x 391=
21) 3522 x 576=
22) 9677 x 203=
23) 2188 x 264=
24) 9199 x 377=
25) 9389 x 713=
26) 3991 x 283=
27) 2062 x 477=
28) 2165 x 823=
29) 8462 x 440=
30) 4078 x 190=
31) 2415 x 689=
32) 2590 x 426=
33) 4100 x 432=
34) 3634 x 398=
35) 8359 x 222=
36) 8913 x 553=
37) 6098 x 573=
38) 7558 x 211=
39) 7096 x 433=
40) 3026 x 814=
41) 8106 x 924=
42) 5490 x 246=
43) 2648 x 868=
44) 1444 x 356=
45) 5855 x 770=
46) 5452 x 837=
47) 2662 x 419=
48) 9149 x 489=
49) 2074 x 312=
50) 1213 x 170=




Answers

1) 4260 * 150 = 639000 2) 6035 * 161 = 971635 3) 8103 * 344 = 2787432 4) 8644 * 842 = 7278248 5) 9799 * 402 = 3939198 6) 3432 * 341 = 1170312 7) 6288 * 549 = 3452112 8) 7870 * 684 = 5383080 9) 2172 * 882 = 1915704 10) 9724 * 332 = 3228368 11) 4382 * 577 = 2528414 12) 9799 * 204 = 1998996 13) 7767 * 996 = 7735932 14) 7914 * 698 = 5523972 15) 8207 * 391 = 3208937 16) 1158 * 708 = 819864 17) 7695 * 173 = 1331235 18) 2254 * 634 = 1429036 19) 8174 * 639 = 5223186 20) 3803 * 391 = 1486973 21) 3522 * 576 = 2028672 22) 9677 * 203 = 1964431 23) 2188 * 264 = 577632 24) 9199 * 377 = 3468023 25) 9389 * 713 = 6694357 26) 3991 * 283 = 1129453 27) 2062 * 477 = 983574 28) 2165 * 823 = 1781795 29) 8462 * 440 = 3723280 30) 4078 * 190 = 774820 31) 2415 * 689 = 1663935 32) 2590 * 426 = 1103340 33) 4100 * 432 = 1771200 34) 3634 * 398 = 1446332 35) 8359 * 222 = 1855698 36) 8913 * 553 = 4928889 37) 6098 * 573 = 3494154 38) 7558 * 211 = 1594738 39) 7096 * 433 = 3072568 40) 3026 * 814 = 2463164 41) 8106 * 924 = 7489944 42) 5490 * 246 = 1350540 43) 2648 * 868 = 2298464 44) 1444 * 356 = 514064 45) 5855 * 770 = 4508350 46) 5452 * 837 = 4563324 47) 2662 * 419 = 1115378 48) 9149 * 489 = 4473861 49) 2074 * 312 = 647088 50) 1213 * 170 = 206210

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 11

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 11

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets