JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 110

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 110

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 19, 2020.

Questions

1) 1304 x 152=
2) 1291 x 830=
3) 5362 x 119=
4) 5132 x 423=
5) 1222 x 115=
6) 4430 x 126=
7) 5870 x 409=
8) 5305 x 911=
9) 6577 x 994=
10) 2239 x 99=
11) 2316 x 811=
12) 8364 x 534=
13) 5779 x 109=
14) 2906 x 151=
15) 9166 x 873=
16) 3258 x 819=
17) 3587 x 768=
18) 9311 x 241=
19) 5980 x 478=
20) 4937 x 933=
21) 7883 x 633=
22) 2313 x 971=
23) 1551 x 221=
24) 4265 x 446=
25) 8368 x 263=
26) 5217 x 604=
27) 2137 x 222=
28) 3313 x 303=
29) 7569 x 534=
30) 2802 x 814=
31) 1851 x 709=
32) 3971 x 579=
33) 2386 x 555=
34) 2867 x 285=
35) 8758 x 745=
36) 2076 x 655=
37) 8506 x 257=
38) 5369 x 657=
39) 3721 x 234=
40) 7097 x 188=
41) 1655 x 134=
42) 7202 x 964=
43) 5225 x 968=
44) 9259 x 271=
45) 8660 x 846=
46) 2425 x 253=
47) 9699 x 125=
48) 8341 x 303=
49) 2575 x 228=
50) 9409 x 427=




Answers

1) 1304 * 152 = 198208 2) 1291 * 830 = 1071530 3) 5362 * 119 = 638078 4) 5132 * 423 = 2170836 5) 1222 * 115 = 140530 6) 4430 * 126 = 558180 7) 5870 * 409 = 2400830 8) 5305 * 911 = 4832855 9) 6577 * 994 = 6537538 10) 2239 * 99 = 221661 11) 2316 * 811 = 1878276 12) 8364 * 534 = 4466376 13) 5779 * 109 = 629911 14) 2906 * 151 = 438806 15) 9166 * 873 = 8001918 16) 3258 * 819 = 2668302 17) 3587 * 768 = 2754816 18) 9311 * 241 = 2243951 19) 5980 * 478 = 2858440 20) 4937 * 933 = 4606221 21) 7883 * 633 = 4989939 22) 2313 * 971 = 2245923 23) 1551 * 221 = 342771 24) 4265 * 446 = 1902190 25) 8368 * 263 = 2200784 26) 5217 * 604 = 3151068 27) 2137 * 222 = 474414 28) 3313 * 303 = 1003839 29) 7569 * 534 = 4041846 30) 2802 * 814 = 2280828 31) 1851 * 709 = 1312359 32) 3971 * 579 = 2299209 33) 2386 * 555 = 1324230 34) 2867 * 285 = 817095 35) 8758 * 745 = 6524710 36) 2076 * 655 = 1359780 37) 8506 * 257 = 2186042 38) 5369 * 657 = 3527433 39) 3721 * 234 = 870714 40) 7097 * 188 = 1334236 41) 1655 * 134 = 221770 42) 7202 * 964 = 6942728 43) 5225 * 968 = 5057800 44) 9259 * 271 = 2509189 45) 8660 * 846 = 7326360 46) 2425 * 253 = 613525 47) 9699 * 125 = 1212375 48) 8341 * 303 = 2527323 49) 2575 * 228 = 587100 50) 9409 * 427 = 4017643

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 110

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 110

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets