JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 111

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 111

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on December 20, 2020.

Questions

1) 7459 x 430=
2) 9811 x 465=
3) 4634 x 932=
4) 8966 x 504=
5) 1696 x 655=
6) 4914 x 623=
7) 3807 x 559=
8) 9946 x 413=
9) 7269 x 790=
10) 4143 x 203=
11) 9852 x 763=
12) 5980 x 730=
13) 7584 x 410=
14) 1584 x 841=
15) 3109 x 757=
16) 5048 x 598=
17) 5709 x 364=
18) 1453 x 361=
19) 1248 x 849=
20) 3562 x 987=
21) 4107 x 747=
22) 8554 x 889=
23) 3992 x 730=
24) 5202 x 616=
25) 7019 x 321=
26) 9765 x 306=
27) 4584 x 900=
28) 2677 x 728=
29) 1771 x 897=
30) 9792 x 997=
31) 2224 x 798=
32) 9943 x 158=
33) 2650 x 661=
34) 7265 x 678=
35) 7373 x 272=
36) 6778 x 613=
37) 9589 x 263=
38) 6813 x 253=
39) 2917 x 255=
40) 3641 x 540=
41) 6900 x 742=
42) 8501 x 978=
43) 3506 x 278=
44) 9305 x 534=
45) 1265 x 212=
46) 1985 x 910=
47) 1161 x 460=
48) 2631 x 307=
49) 3466 x 907=
50) 5669 x 189=




Answers

1) 7459 * 430 = 3207370 2) 9811 * 465 = 4562115 3) 4634 * 932 = 4318888 4) 8966 * 504 = 4518864 5) 1696 * 655 = 1110880 6) 4914 * 623 = 3061422 7) 3807 * 559 = 2128113 8) 9946 * 413 = 4107698 9) 7269 * 790 = 5742510 10) 4143 * 203 = 841029 11) 9852 * 763 = 7517076 12) 5980 * 730 = 4365400 13) 7584 * 410 = 3109440 14) 1584 * 841 = 1332144 15) 3109 * 757 = 2353513 16) 5048 * 598 = 3018704 17) 5709 * 364 = 2078076 18) 1453 * 361 = 524533 19) 1248 * 849 = 1059552 20) 3562 * 987 = 3515694 21) 4107 * 747 = 3067929 22) 8554 * 889 = 7604506 23) 3992 * 730 = 2914160 24) 5202 * 616 = 3204432 25) 7019 * 321 = 2253099 26) 9765 * 306 = 2988090 27) 4584 * 900 = 4125600 28) 2677 * 728 = 1948856 29) 1771 * 897 = 1588587 30) 9792 * 997 = 9762624 31) 2224 * 798 = 1774752 32) 9943 * 158 = 1570994 33) 2650 * 661 = 1751650 34) 7265 * 678 = 4925670 35) 7373 * 272 = 2005456 36) 6778 * 613 = 4154914 37) 9589 * 263 = 2521907 38) 6813 * 253 = 1723689 39) 2917 * 255 = 743835 40) 3641 * 540 = 1966140 41) 6900 * 742 = 5119800 42) 8501 * 978 = 8313978 43) 3506 * 278 = 974668 44) 9305 * 534 = 4968870 45) 1265 * 212 = 268180 46) 1985 * 910 = 1806350 47) 1161 * 460 = 534060 48) 2631 * 307 = 807717 49) 3466 * 907 = 3143662 50) 5669 * 189 = 1071441

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 111

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 111

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets