JustMath.org

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Multiply 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Created on December 21, 2020.

Questions

1) 6275 x 487=
2) 2093 x 901=
3) 6993 x 596=
4) 6378 x 173=
5) 7645 x 183=
6) 4817 x 365=
7) 8353 x 835=
8) 6243 x 903=
9) 3613 x 843=
10) 1607 x 402=
11) 7294 x 746=
12) 4166 x 372=
13) 4848 x 388=
14) 7059 x 218=
15) 6559 x 330=
16) 1050 x 412=
17) 3860 x 798=
18) 8893 x 557=
19) 4908 x 141=
20) 4129 x 920=
21) 2718 x 239=
22) 6834 x 958=
23) 1793 x 201=
24) 1777 x 134=
25) 4520 x 858=
26) 6393 x 657=
27) 8872 x 339=
28) 8439 x 892=
29) 1728 x 871=
30) 5879 x 489=
31) 9712 x 550=
32) 5879 x 532=
33) 2967 x 377=
34) 1636 x 881=
35) 5600 x 900=
36) 7721 x 287=
37) 3568 x 690=
38) 9006 x 979=
39) 1988 x 867=
40) 4923 x 171=
41) 5560 x 512=
42) 2800 x 391=
43) 7885 x 731=
44) 5823 x 848=
45) 9675 x 730=
46) 6029 x 396=
47) 1510 x 554=
48) 6427 x 221=
49) 9891 x 989=
50) 7663 x 400=




Answers

1) 6275 * 487 = 3055925 2) 2093 * 901 = 1885793 3) 6993 * 596 = 4167828 4) 6378 * 173 = 1103394 5) 7645 * 183 = 1399035 6) 4817 * 365 = 1758205 7) 8353 * 835 = 6974755 8) 6243 * 903 = 5637429 9) 3613 * 843 = 3045759 10) 1607 * 402 = 646014 11) 7294 * 746 = 5441324 12) 4166 * 372 = 1549752 13) 4848 * 388 = 1881024 14) 7059 * 218 = 1538862 15) 6559 * 330 = 2164470 16) 1050 * 412 = 432600 17) 3860 * 798 = 3080280 18) 8893 * 557 = 4953401 19) 4908 * 141 = 692028 20) 4129 * 920 = 3798680 21) 2718 * 239 = 649602 22) 6834 * 958 = 6546972 23) 1793 * 201 = 360393 24) 1777 * 134 = 238118 25) 4520 * 858 = 3878160 26) 6393 * 657 = 4200201 27) 8872 * 339 = 3007608 28) 8439 * 892 = 7527588 29) 1728 * 871 = 1505088 30) 5879 * 489 = 2874831 31) 9712 * 550 = 5341600 32) 5879 * 532 = 3127628 33) 2967 * 377 = 1118559 34) 1636 * 881 = 1441316 35) 5600 * 900 = 5040000 36) 7721 * 287 = 2215927 37) 3568 * 690 = 2461920 38) 9006 * 979 = 8816874 39) 1988 * 867 = 1723596 40) 4923 * 171 = 841833 41) 5560 * 512 = 2846720 42) 2800 * 391 = 1094800 43) 7885 * 731 = 5763935 44) 5823 * 848 = 4937904 45) 9675 * 730 = 7062750 46) 6029 * 396 = 2387484 47) 1510 * 554 = 836540 48) 6427 * 221 = 1420367 49) 9891 * 989 = 9782199 50) 7663 * 400 = 3065200

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

More 6th - Grade Worksheets

Ratios worksheets 112

Prime numbers Worksheet 112

Percent worksheets 112

multiplication 4 digit by 2 digit Worksheet 112

multiplication 4 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 112

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Fractions Subtraction with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Subtraction with like denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with unlike denominator worksheets 112

Fractions Addition with like denominator worksheets 112

Factors worksheet112

Division with reminder Worksheet 112

Ratios worksheets 111

Prime numbers Worksheet 111

Percent worksheets 111

>> More 6th Grade Worksheets